Antonio v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG20081917

Tags
Last Updated May 1, 2021 at 1:19 PM DT (1.8 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Antonio, Carlo, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson-hartwell, Cheryl, Attorney
No Logo Zambrano, Ronald L, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None ?
Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Dropped from dept: 20 date: 04/14/2021 time: 09:00 AM
    Blank 12 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None ?
    Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/20/2022 03:00 PM D- 20
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None ?
        Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None ?
          Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Stay Action and Transfer Matter to Binding Arbit (7 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 8 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None ?
            Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 04/14/2021 09:00 AM D- 20
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None ?
              Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (110 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                  Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Initial Case Management Conference 06/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 20 (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Carlo Antonio (2 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Complaint - Other Employment Filed (8 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?