Dutton v. Tesla Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG21094568

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:29 PM DT (1.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dutton, Jeff, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Barry Esq, David N., Attorney
No Logo Tahsildoost, Soheyl, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: None ?
Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted (3 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None ?
    Motion to Compel (Motion) Taken Under Submission (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None ?
      Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 14 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None ?
        Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 22 date: 07/20/2021 time: 02:30 PM
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None ?
          Motion to Compel (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None ?
            Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None ?
              Declaration of Gianna Cherry in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (4 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/23/2021, Entered: None ?
                Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Filed (12 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (17 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 06/29/2021 02:30 PM D- 22
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (52 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla Inc. Filed (2 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                          Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None ?
                            Initial Case Management Conference 11/02/2021 02:30 PM D- 22 (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                              Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jeff Dutton (3 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None ?
                                  Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (9 Pages)

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?