City Spy Connection, Inc. v. Tesla Motors, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG21094928

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:29 PM DT (1.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City Spy Connection, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Younan, Sargon, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc."
No Logo Jacobson, Kevin Y, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 9/3/2021, Entered: None ?
Hearing Reset to Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) 09/10/2021 02:00 PM D- 520
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None ?
    Proposed Order Received (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None ?
      Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Filed (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/24/2021, Entered: None ?
        Notice of Opposition to Motion to Compel Filed (11 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None ?
          Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support to Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration (Motion Not (40 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 13 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None ?
            Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/30/2021 02:00 PM D- 520
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None ?
                Amended Notice of Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration Filed (2 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Statement of Tesla Motors, Inc. Filed (6 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Reservation Set for dept: 520 date: 09/03/2021 time: 02:00 P
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Notice of Posting Advance Jury Fees Filed (4 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Case Management Statement of City Spy Connection, Inc. , Sargon Younan Filed (9 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/21/2021, Entered: None ?
                          Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla Motors, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                            Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None ?
                              Initial Case Management Conference 08/11/2021 09:30 AM D- 520 (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None ?
                                Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None ?
                                  Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for City Spy Connection, Inc. (2 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None ?
                                    Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (7 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 23 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?