Renderos v. Clearview AI, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG21091138

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 1, 2021 at 5:21 PM EDT (7.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Knox , Lisa, Plaintiff
No Logo Maldonado , Reyna, Plaintiff
No Logo Mijente Support Committee, Plaintiff
No Logo Norcal Resist Fund, Plaintiff
No Logo Renderos , Steven, Plaintiff
No Logo Rojas , Valeria Thais Suarez, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alameda County District Attorney, Defendant
No Logo Alameda Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Antioch Police Department, Defendant
Clearview AI, Inc. Clearview AI, Inc., Defendant
No Logo El Segundo Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Leonida, Ellen, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Complaint
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None ?
Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered (2 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None ?
    Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None ?
      Proof of Service by Mail RE: Notice of Motion for S. Zota to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None ?
        Proof of Service by Mail re: Notice of Motion for D. McCoy to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None ?
          Notice of Removal Filed for Clearview AI, Inc. (98 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: None ?
            Summons Issued and Filed (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None ?
              First Amended Complaint Filed (26 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                Verified Application of Sejal R. Zota to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed (4 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas, Reyna Maldonado, Lisa (4 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Motion for Pro Hac Vice Filed by Steven Renderos, Valeria Thais Suarez Rojas, Reyna Maldonado, Lisa (4 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Motion for Pro Hac Vice Hearing Confirmed for 05/14/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
                        Blank 8 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                        Motion for Pro Hac Vice Hearing Confirmed for 05/14/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None ?
                          Verified Application of Dinesh McCoy to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed (4 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None ?
                            Summons Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None ?
                              Case Management Conference 05/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 21 (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/15/2021, Entered: None ?
                                Complex Determination Hearing 04/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 21
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None ?
                                  Complex Designation Requested
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None ?
                                    Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Steven Renderos (2 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None ?
                                      Complaint - Other Filed (23 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?