GEICO v. Tesla
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of New Jersey, County of Camden, Case No. CAM-L-001196-21

Tags
Last Updated May 3, 2021 at 5:01 PM DT (2.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Government Employees Insurance Company (GEICO), Plaintiff
Officially listed as "GEICO"
v.
No Logo Alek Chen, Defendant
No Logo Anna Chzhen, Defendant
No Logo Erika Chen, Defendant
No Logo Irini Chen, Defendant
No Logo Kim Lam, Defendant
No Logo Michael P Gao, Defendant
No Logo New Jersey State Police, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla"
No Logo Vladimir Chen, Defendant
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None
COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None
    GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by CARTON, CHRISTOPHER, R of BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP on behalf of TESLA against GEICO
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None
      OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by LEEDS, CHRISTOPHER, N of CIPRIANI & WERNER PC on behalf of VLADIMIR CHEN, ALEK CHEN, IRINI CHEN, VLADIMIR CHEN, IRINI CHEN ET AL. against GEICO, TESLA, MICHAEL P GAO, KIM LAM, NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE *LINKED FILING*
        Blank 2 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None
        TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: None
          Verified Complaint for CAM-L-001196-21 submitted by READY, COLLEEN M, MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN on behalf of GEICO against TESLA, VLADIMIR CHEN, IRINI CHEN, VLADIMIR CHEN, IRINI CHEN ET AL.

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 669 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?