Flagg, et al v. AMR Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-06810-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Marcus Flagg, Plaintiff

Represented by Hanly Conroy Bierstein Sheridan Fisher & Hayes, LLP

Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

v.
AirTran Airways AirTran Airways, Defendant
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
American Airlines, Inc. Officer/Director, American Airlines, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mesa Airlines Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Argenbright Security, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Coast Airlines, Defendant
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Delta Airlines"
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
Officer/Director, Clear Secure, Inc.
No Logo Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority, Defendant
No Logo National Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Northwest Airlines, Defendant
No Logo Securicor PLC, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CAMPBELL, CAMPBELL, EDWARDS & CONROY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/8/2003
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 11/28/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
102-cv-00458-AKH
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, RELATED
  Entries (103) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Judgment*Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that there is no just reason for delay pursuant to FRCP 54(b), settling the action as to 03 CV 6810(AKH) and dismissing the complaint with prejudice as to all defendants. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/27/07) (Attachments: # (1) notice of right to appeal)(ml)
    LREF
    Legal Document 89 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
    DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: [87] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond)
      LREF
      Legal Document 88 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [87] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Barry, Desmond)
        LREF
        Legal Document 87 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007, Terminated: 11/28/2007 ~Motion for Judgment
        MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..(Barry, Desmond)
          LREF
          Legal Document 86 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Adoption of Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # (1) Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint)(Lent, Eric)
            LREF
            Legal Document 85 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of Notice of Adoption to Flight 7 Fourth Amended MLC. Document filed by Delta Airlines. (Crowley, Michael)
              LREF
              Legal Document 84 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint (Document No. 1301 in 21MC97 (AKH)). Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Wayland, Joseph)
                LREF
                Legal Document 83 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE of Adoption by Defendant Airtran Airways, Inc.. Document filed by Air Tran Airways. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of service)(Coster, James)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 82 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice Adopting Answer of Defendant United Air Lines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint served on All Parties on 11/13/2007. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Sexton, Brian)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 81 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE of Adoption of Master Answer to Plaintiffs' Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 80 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of Adopting Answer of Defendant United Air Lines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint# (2) Affidavit of Service of Answer to Fourth Amended Master Liability Complaint)(Sexton, Brian)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 79 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of Adoption. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Flight 77 Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint (21-MC-00097))(Barry, Desmond)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 78 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall mark each of the captioned actions as settled but maintain open files on each action until such times as the Court enters an Order approving the settlement, entering final judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b), ruling that the liability limitation of Section 408(a)(1) of the Air Transportation Safety and System Stabilization Act applies to the settlement and dismissing the Complaint with prejudice... and as further set forth in said order. This Document relates to 21mc97, 02-6378, 02-6379, 03-6808, 03-6810, 03-1016, 03-6183, 03-6800. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/1/07) (rjm)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 76 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                            CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER... All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case who are not yet registered to file documents electronically, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by November 1, 2006. Forms can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. As of October 17, 2006 all documents filed in the Miscellaneous case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the Court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov. All correspondences are to be submitted in either Word or WordPerfect format to WTC_letters@nysd.uscourts.gov. The subject heading of the email must include the case number of the action or actions that the email pertains to. No correspondences are to be sent to Chambers through regular mail. No correspondences should be in the form of a motion. Amended complaints and supplemental pleading shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action to which they are being added... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK,1:02-cv-00456-AKH,1:02-cv-00458-AKH,1:02-cv-01727-AKH,1:02-cv-01728-AKH,1:02-cv-03676-AKH,1:02-cv-06186-AKH,1:02-cv-06364-AKH,1:02-cv-06365-AKH,1:02-cv-06378-AKH,1:02-cv-06379-AKH,1:02-cv-07144-AKH,1:02-cv-07145-AKH,1:02-cv-07147-AKH,1:02-cv-07149-AKH,1:02-cv-07150-AKH,1:02-cv-07153-AKH,1:02-cv-07154-AKH,1:02-cv-07155-AKH,1:02-cv-07156-AKH,1:02-cv-07259-AKH,1:02-cv-07260-AKH,1:02-cv-07261-AKH,1:02-cv-07289-AKH,1:02-cv-07290-AKH,1:02-cv-07608-AKH,1:02-cv-07912-AKH,1:02-cv-08916-AKH,1:02-cv-08918-AKH,1:02-cv-08919-AKH,1:02-cv-09234-AKH,1:02-cv-10273-AKH,1:03-cv-00006-AKH,1:03-cv-00029-AKH,1:03-cv-00332-AKH-THK,1:03-cv-01016-AKH,1:03-cv-06183-AKH,1:03-cv-06801-AKH,1:03-cv-06805-AKH,1:03-cv-06843-AKH,1:03-cv-06929-AKH,1:03-cv-06940-AKH,1:03-cv-07019-AKH,1:03-cv-07040-AKH,1:03-cv-07641-AKH,1:03-cv-10203-AKH,1:04-cv-00365-AKH,1:04-cv-01857-AKH,1:04-cv-07189-AKH,1:04-cv-07226-AKH,1:04-cv-07298-AKH,1:04-cv-08067-AKH,1:04-cv-09627-AKH,1:05-cv-07243-AKH,1:06-cv-02990-AKH,1:06-cv-05115-AKH,1:06-cv-05967-AKH,2:03-cv-06105-AKH,2:03-cv-06310-AKH,2:03-cv-06800-AKH,2:03-cv-06802-AKH,2:03-cv-06803-AKH,2:03-cv-06808-AKH,2:03-cv-06810-AKH,2:03-cv-06811-AKH,2:03-cv-06838-AKH,2:03-cv-06966-AKH,2:03-cv-06968-AKH,2:03-cv-07021-AKH,2:03-cv-07022-AKH,2:03-cv-07071-AKH,2:03-cv-07076-AKH,2:03-cv-07083-AKH,2:03-cv-07084-AKH(mj, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 75 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Justin B. Kaplan is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #872)(sn)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 74 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Joseph F. Rice is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #871)(sn)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                  NOTICE of Dismissal as to Individual Defendants (this document relates to 02cv7150, 03cv6802, 02cv6364, 02cv7154, 02cv6363, 02cv6378, 02cv7153, 02cv6379, 02cv29, 02cv7920, 02cv7145, 03cv6808, 03cv6810, 03cv6801, 03cv6811, 02cv7149, 03cv7147, 02cv2802, 02cv458, 02cv7152, 02cv7147, 02cv1727, 03cv6800, 02cv6365, 02cv8919); pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the F.R.C.P., plaintiffs in the above cases dismiss all claims asserted in this action against the following defendants: Air Jamaica, Austrian Airlines, British Midland Airways Ltd., BWIA International Airways, Ethiopian Airlines S.C., KLM, Saudi Arabian Airlines, Scandinavian Airlines System, Swiss. The action remains pending as it is not dismissed as to any other defendant. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/22/2004) Original document filed in case no 21mc97, doc. #614.(kkc, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 73 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                    Amended Notice Adopting Amended Answer Of Defendants United Air Lines, INC. To Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 72 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                      Amended Notice Adopting Master Answer Of Defendant US Airways, INC. To Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint And Jury Demand. Document filed by US Airways. (jmi, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 71 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to AEROFLOT RUSSIAN AIRLINES,("AEROFLOT"), AIR FRANCE, JETBLUE AIRWAYS ("JETBLUE"), KOREAN AIRLINES and TACA INTERNATIONAL (a/k/a "GROUPO TACA") only. The action remains pending as it is not dismissed as to any other Defendant. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/25/04) (dt, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of co-counsel for defendant The Boeing Company. Original filed in case 21MC91, Doc# 561 (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/04) (jco, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 70 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                            NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant US Airways, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint and JURY DEMAND. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc. Related document: [5] Amended Complaint, filed by Marcus Flagg.(kw, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 69 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that pursuant to Rule 41 of the F.R.C.P. this action is dismissed as to defendant Air Transport Association of America, Inc. without prejudice. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/25/04) (jco, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 66 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE ADOPTING ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AMR CORPORATION AND AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS SECONDED AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. (laq)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                  NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. (dfe, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                    NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Atlantic Coast Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Atlantic Coast Airlines. (dfe, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) of the F.R.C.P. without prejudice of Security Equipment Manufacturer Defendants. (This document relates to 21MC97 as document #487.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/18/04) (pl, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendants Delta Air Lines, Inc., Incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Airlines. (dfe, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (ps, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                            NOTICE of adoption of its Master Answer to plaintiffs Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc.. (jp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                              NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (gf, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED FLIGHT 77 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (sac, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  ORDER granting Motion for Elizabeth Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/22/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21mc97, doc. #334.(kkc, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/21/2004 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                    MOTION; for an order pursuant to Local Civl Rule 1.3(c) of the F.R.C.P. granting Elizabeth Smith permission to appear as attorney of record for the plaintiffs; w/ attch. affidavit in support; Document filed by plaintiffs. (orig. document docketed in 02cv0456 as document #42). (pl, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. National Airlines, Inc. served on 2/25/2004, answer due 3/16/2004. Service was accepted by CT Corporation/ Gerome Jones. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; National Airlines, Inc.. (db, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Atlantic Coast Airlines served on 2/25/2004, answer due 3/16/2004. Service was accepted by Brandy Anderson. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; Atlantic Coast Airlines. (db, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 9/4/2007 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                          CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons and Amended Complaint mailed to Securicor PLC at the following address: Sutton Park House 15 Carshalton Road, Sutton, London, United Kingdom SM1 4LD on 3/19/2004 by Registered Mail # rb 632 316 793. (aba)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            MEMO-ENDORSEMENT ON MOTIONS ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Jeffrey Scott Thompson for Marcus Flagg, Ronald L. Motley for Marcus Flagg, Jodi Westbrook Flowers for Marcus Flagg, Robert T. Haefele for Marcus Flagg, Donald A. Migliori for Marcus Flagg, Mary F. Schiavo for Marcus Flagg admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/4/2004) Original Endorsements filed in case no. 21 MC 97, docs. # 289 (Jeffrey Scott Thompson), # 290 (Ronald L. Motley), # 291 (Jodi Westbrook Flowers), # 292 (Robert T. Haefele), # 293 (Donald A. Migliori), # 304 (Mary Schiavo).(kkc, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint; Order Suspending Case served. Argenbright Security, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Monique Jobes. Document filed by Argenbright Security, Inc.. (sac, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint; Order Suspending Case served. Delta Airlines served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Valerie Holmes. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint; Order Suspending Case served. Quantam Magnetics, Inc. served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Lowell Burnett, Agent. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint; Order Suspending Case served. United Airlines, Inc. served on 12/24/2003, answer due 1/13/2004. Service was accepted by Nikki Chapple, Registered Agent. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint; Order Suspending Case served. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 1/6/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Becky DeGeorge. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint; Order Suspending Case served. Northwest Airlines served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Deb Van Ness, Agent. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint; Order Suspending Case served. Air Transport Association served on 1/2/2004, answer due 1/22/2004. Service was accepted by David Berg. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Barbara Barnes. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint; Order Suspending Case served. Midwest Express Airlines, Inc. served on 12/30/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Mary Iden, Legal Assistant. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint; Order Suspending Case. Air Tran Airways served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Collen A.Devries, Vice President. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint; Order Suspending Case. American Airlines, Inc. served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004; Continental Airlines, Inc. served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004; L-3 Communications Corporation served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004; L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004; US Airways served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004. Service was accepted by Paula Kash, Process Specialist. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint and Order Suspending Case served. Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 12/30/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Jim Walden. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint and Order Suspending Case served. The Boeing Company served on 12/30/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Jenise Gogan, Agent. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint and Order Suspending Case served. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Vivian Imperial, Process Specialist. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint and aslo Order Suspending Case, served. AMR Corporation served on 1/5/2004, answer due 1/26/2004. Service was accepted by Lisa Magdaleno, Subpoena Clerk. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Lufthansa served on 12/29/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Sabine Simon. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; Lufthansa. (laq, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/11/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. Original Document filed in 21 mc 97, Doc. #279. (sac, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. AMR Corporation served on 11/3/2003, answer due 11/23/2003. Service was accepted by Shirley Dillon, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (pl, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served upon British Airways Corp.. Service was accepted by Maureen Renehan, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (pl, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served upon Quantum Magenetics, Inc. Service was accepted by Lowell J. Burnett. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (pl, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served upon ANA. Service was accepted by Frank J. Costello, Esq.. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (pl, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. The Boeing Company served on 12/1/2003, answer due 12/21/2003. Service was accepted by Marsha Montgomery. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; The Boeing Company. (db, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Austrian Airlines served on 12/11/2003, answer due 12/31/2003. Service was accepted by Sara Clarden. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; Austrian Airlines. (db, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Aeroflot served on 12/1/2003, answer due 12/21/2003. Service was accepted by Elizabeth Diaz. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; Aeroflot. (db, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 11/18/2003, answer due 12/8/2003. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; L-3 Communications Corporation. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 10/29/2003, answer due 11/18/2003. Service was accepted by Becky Degeorge. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; Invision Technologies, Inc. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Air France served on 11/18/2003, answer due 12/8/2003. Service was accepted by Greg Kozlowksi, Legal Counsel. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; Air France. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Swiss served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Lisa Stiegler. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. United Airlines, Inc. served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Mia Wintersmith. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Korean Airlines served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Catalina Kim, authorized agent. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. BWIA International Airways served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Tracey Butler. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Air Tran Airways served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Mia Wintersmith, authorized agent. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems served on 1/3/2004, answer due 1/23/2004. Service was accepted by Roger McLeon. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. KLM served on 12/17/2003, answer due 1/6/2004. Service was accepted by Chris Jenkins-Wiener authorized agent. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Argenbright Security, Inc. served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Cindy Zidick. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. British Midland Airways Ltd. served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Lisa Stiegler. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; British Midland Airways Ltd. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Taca International Airlines served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Kenneth A. Hoffman. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Midwest Express Airlines, Inc. served on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Brandy Anderson. Document filed by Midwest Express Airlines, Inc. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Scandinavian Airlines System, SAS served on 12/30/2003, answer due 1/19/2004. Service was accepted by Jorgen Hoe-Knudsen, Vice President. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 10/29/2003, answer due 11/18/2003. Service was accepted by Becky DeGeorge, Clerk. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and complaint to Continental Airlines, Inc. served on 11/4/2003, answer due 11/24/2003. Service was accepted by Lynne Key. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Ethiopian Airlines S.C. served on 11/24/2003, answer due 12/14/2003. Service was accepted by Andrew Cutton. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 11/18/2003, answer due 12/8/2003. Service was accepted by Ct. Corp/Nora Dindyal. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Virgin Atlantic Airways Ltd. served on 12/1/2003, answer due 12/21/2003. Service was accepted by Christina Bonney. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; Virgin Atlantic Airways Ltd.. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Air Tran Airways served on 12/19/2003, answer due 1/8/2004. Service was accepted by Anne Boutilier, process section head. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Northwest Airlines served on 11/25/2003, answer due 12/15/2003. Service was accepted by Karen Clower. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; Northwest Airlines. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority served on 12/1/2003, answer due 12/21/2003. Service was accepted by Barbara Barnes. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. American Airlines, Inc. served on 10/31/2003, answer due 11/20/2003. Service was accepted by Ct Corp/Shirley Dillon. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Air Transport Association served on 12/8/2003, answer due 12/28/2003. Service was accepted by Mimi Soloman. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; Air Transport Association. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. US Airways served on 11/7/2003, answer due 11/27/2003. Service was accepted by Tanika Baylor. Document filed by Marcus Flagg ; US Airways. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 12/12/2003, answer due 1/5/2004. Service was accepted by Carla Brateng, Corp. Officer. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. JetBlue served on 12/11/2003, answer due 12/31/2003. Service was accepted by Nicole Gurdoglanyan, Agent. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Service of summons and complaint made on Saudi Arabian Airlines on 11/5/03. Service was accepted by Tracey Butler, United States Corporation Co. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Delta Airlines served summons and complaint on 11/5/2003, answer due 11/25/2003. Service was accepted by Valarie Holmes. Document filed by Marcus Flagg. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against National Airlines, Inc., Atlantic Coast Airlines, AMR Corporation, Air Tran Airways, American Airlines, Inc., Argenbright Security, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Delta Airlines, Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority, Northwest Airlines, Securicor PLC, The Boeing Company, United Airlines, Inc. Document filed by Marcus Flagg, National Airlines, Inc. Related document: [1] Complaint.(yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Set Answer Due Date for Amended Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Answer Due Date re: [5] Amended Complaint, as to AMR Corporation answer due on 1/26/2004; Air Tran Airways answer due on 1/26/2004; American Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Argenbright Security, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Continental Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004; Delta Airlines answer due on 1/26/2004; Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority answer due on 1/26/2004; Northwest Airlines answer due on 1/26/2004; Securicor PLC answer due on 1/26/2004; The Boeing Company answer due on 1/26/2004; United Airlines, Inc. answer due on 1/26/2004. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED CONSENT AND ORDER TO CHANGE ATTORNEY; that Motley Rice LLC, 28 Bridgeside Blvd., P.O. Box 1792, Mt. Pleasant, SC 29465, is being substituted as counsel for the plaintiffs in this action, instead of Baum Hedlund, 12100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 950, Los Angeles, CA 90025. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/31/2003) Original document filed under case no. 21 MC 97, doc. # 249.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF DISMISSAL, (This document relates to 02-3676, 8918, 03-7148, 02-7143, 5139, 03-6809, 02-8916, 7156, 7155, 03-6803, 02-7271, 03-7149, 02-2004, 03-7150, 6804, 02-7144, 03-6806, 6802, 02-7154, 6363, 7151, 7204, 7153, 7152, 03-6811, 6801, 7147, 02-458, 2802, 1727, 6365, 6364, 7150, 6378, 7149, 6379, 452, 03-029, 6808, 6810, 02-7147, 7148, 7146, 7920, 03-6944, 6800, 02-7145, 8919, 7272, 03-6807, 02-7258, 7261, 7260, 456, 7262, 1728, 03-6805, 02-6362, 7259 & 6361) pursuant to the Court's directions at the Status Conference on 9/26/03, and pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2), plaintiffs in each of the designated cases herein, dismiss with prejudice the "DOE" defendants. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); ORIGINAL DOCUMENT ENTERED IN CASE #21 MC 97(AKH), DOC. #199. (tp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/25/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; granting [2-1] motion for an Order placing the above captioned matter in suspense, which shall not constitute an election of remedies so as to prevent plaintiff form seeking compensation from the Victims Compensation Fund, so long as this lawsuit remains dormant and in suspense until the earlier of such time as set forth in enumerated paragraph 3 of the Court's Order of July 22, 2003. This case shall be placed on the suspense docket immediately following filing of proof of service of summons and complaint. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); (sac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Case assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: John A. Greaves, Mary F. Schiavo . (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case accepted as related to 1:02cv458. Notice of assignment to follow. (gf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003, Terminated: 9/25/2003 Motion to Place on Suspense Docket
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION by Marcus Flagg, Marcus Flagg for an Order placing the above captioned matter in suspense, which shall not constitute an election of remedies so as to prevent plaintiff form seeking compensation from the Victims Compensation Fund, so long as this lawsuit remains dormant and in suspense until the earlier of such time as set forth in enumerated paragraph 3 of the Court's Order of July 22, 2003 . Return Date Not Indicated. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 484259. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related 1:02cv458. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 222 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?