CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-01246-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 7, 2021 at 7:33 PM DT (2.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nikhel Sus +1 202 408 5565 +1 202 897 1996 nsus@citizensforethics.org
v.
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE"
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY"
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/6/2021
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE I-FOIA
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2021, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Answer to Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/30/2021, Entered: 5/30/2021 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/28/2021; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 5/12/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/12/2021. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/11/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/12/21. (Sus, Nikhel)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: 5/20/2021 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/20/21. (DM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: 5/7/2021 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # (1) Notice and Consent)(znmg)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                  Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                    LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: 5/6/2021 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8430753) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons Attorney General, # (3) Summons U.S. Attorney, # (4) Summons Treasury, # (5) Summons State)(Sus, Nikhel)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 88 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?