Penrod Management Group Inc. v. Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10649-DFE

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Penrod Management Group, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Vincent Marks +1 212 513 3531 +1 212 385 9010 james.marks@hklaw.com
Space Christine Tramontano +1 212 513 3598 +1 212 385 9010 christine.tramontano@hklaw.com
v.
No Logo Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan P. Mulvaney +1 973 622 7711 +1 973 622 5314

Represented by McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

Office Foley Square
Filed 11/28/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County XX Out of State
Terminated 6/23/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton. I hereby close the above Order of Reference for magistrate judge statistical purposes. I scheduled the trial for Monday, 6/23/08. On Friday, 6/20/08, the parties advised that they had reached a settlement; on consent, I signed an Order of Discontinuance. (ae)
    LREF
    Legal Document 47 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Order of DiscontinuanceCourt Filing
    ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE that the action be, and the same hereby is, discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that on or before 9/10/08 Stewart's Mobile Concepts may apply to Magistrate Judge Eaton by letter (by fax and by mail) for restoration of the action to the calendar if the settlement is not effected, in which event the action will be restored to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Eaton. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton on 6/20/08) (cd)
      LREF
      Legal Document 46 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
      DECLARATION of Jack Penrod (with signature page that was omitted from ECF document #26) in Support re: [24] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Jack Penrod.. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc.. (Tramontano, Christine)
        LREF
        Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Pretrial Memorandum
        PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix pages 1-17, # (2) Appendix pages 18-30)(Sheely, Sean)
          LREF
          Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [28] MOTION in Limine on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts to bar the introduction of certain documents and testimony.. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc.. (Sheely, Sean)
            LREF
            Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
            DECLARATION of Ryan P. Mulvaney, Esq. in Opposition re: [24] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Jack Penrod.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-F, # (2) Exhibit G-Q, # (3) Exhibit R, # (4) Exhibit S-T, # (5) Exhibit U-Z)(Mills, Richard)
              LREF
              Legal Document 42 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
              DECLARATION of Ryan P. Mulvaney, Esq. in Opposition re: [24] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Jack Penrod.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-F, # (2) Exhibit G-Q, # (3) Exhibit S-T, # (4) Exhibit U-Z)(Mills, Richard)
                LREF
                Legal Document 41 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [24] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Jack Penrod.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Mills, Richard)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                  DECLARATION of Ryan P. Mulvaney in Opposition re: [23] MOTION in Limine Precluding the Admission in Evidence of the Direct Examination of Affidavit of Bob Hiss.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Mills, Richard)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [23] MOTION in Limine Precluding the Admission in Evidence of the Direct Examination of Affidavit of Bob Hiss.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Mills, Richard)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                      DECLARATION of Ryan P. Mulvaney in Support re: [28] MOTION in Limine on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts to bar the introduction of certain documents and testimony.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-H, # (2) Exhibit I-M, # (3) Exhibit N Part 1, # (4) Exhibit N Part 2, # (5) Exhibit O to P)(Mills, Richard)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
                        ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Richard Mills to RE-FILE Document [30] Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Exhibits are non-ecf documents. Exhibits must be filed as attachments to the document they are supporting. (jar)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Trial Brief
                          TRIAL BRIEF Certification of R. Mulvaney attaching two unpublished opinions. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd..(Mills, Richard)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Trial Brief
                            TRIAL BRIEF of Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Mills, Richard)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                              FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of R. Mulvaney Exhibits O through P in Support re: [28] MOTION in Limine on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts to bar the introduction of certain documents and testimony.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Mills, Richard) Modified on 6/4/2008 (jar).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of R. Mulvaney Exhibit N Part 2 in Support re: [28] MOTION in Limine on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts to bar the introduction of certain documents and testimony.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd. (Mills, Richard) Modified on 6/4/2008 (jar). Modified on 6/4/2008 (jar).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                  FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of R. Mulvaney Exhibit N Part 1 in Support re: [28] MOTION in Limine on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts to bar the introduction of certain documents and testimony.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Mills, Richard) Modified on 6/4/2008 (jar). Modified on 6/4/2008 (jar).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                    FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of R. Mulvaney Exhibits I through M in Support re: [28] MOTION in Limine on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts to bar the introduction of certain documents and testimony.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Mills, Richard) Modified on 6/4/2008 (jar).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of R. Mulvaney Exhibits A-H in Support re: [28] MOTION in Limine on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts to bar the introduction of certain documents and testimony.. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Mills, Richard) Modified on 6/4/2008 (jar). Modified on 6/4/2008 (jar).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Ryan P. Mulvaney in Support re: [28] MOTION in Limine on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts to bar the introduction of certain documents and testimony. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd. (Mills, Richard) Modified on 6/4/2008 (jar).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Brief
                                          BRIEF re: [28] MOTION in Limine on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts to bar the introduction of certain documents and testimony. and for an adverse inference. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd..(Mills, Richard)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008, Terminated: 6/23/2008 Motion in Limine
                                            MOTION in Limine on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts to bar the introduction of certain documents and testimony. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Mills, Richard)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [24] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Jack Penrod., [23] MOTION in Limine Precluding the Admission in Evidence of the Direct Examination of Affidavit of Bob Hiss.. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc.. (Tramontano, Christine)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                DECLARATION of Jack Penrod in Support re: [24] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Jack Penrod., [23] MOTION in Limine Precluding the Admission in Evidence of the Direct Examination of Affidavit of Bob Hiss.. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc.. (Tramontano, Christine)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                  DECLARATION of Christine Tramontano in Support re: [24] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Jack Penrod., [23] MOTION in Limine Precluding the Admission in Evidence of the Direct Examination of Affidavit of Bob Hiss.. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-E)(Tramontano, Christine)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008, Terminated: 6/23/2008 Motion to Quash
                                                    MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Jack Penrod. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc..(Tramontano, Christine)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008, Terminated: 6/23/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                      MOTION in Limine Precluding the Admission in Evidence of the Direct Examination of Affidavit of Bob Hiss. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc..(Tramontano, Christine)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, setting the listed trial scheduling deadlines as further set forth in this document. The non-jury trial will be held in Courtroom 18A from 9:45 am to 5:00 pm on 6/9 and 6/10/08, and (if necessary) on 6/23 and 24/08. ( Bench Trial set for 6/9/2008 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 18A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton on 4/4/08) Copies sent by chambers(cd)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [12] Motion for Ryan P. Mulvaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stewart's Mobile Concepts. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/1/08) (cd)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk
                                                            Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: [21] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (cd)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/15/2008 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (jp)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Penrod Management Group Inc., Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd. CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/4/08) (cd)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Consent under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for all purposes (including trial). Referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/29/08) (js)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                    OPINION AND ORDER #95738: Penrod's motion for a stay of the arbitration pending this Court's decision on the issue of whether Penrod is required to proceed with the arbitration is granted. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/16/08) (tro) Modified on 2/25/2008 (mr).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER: By 2/29/08, the parties should advise the Court whether the parties consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. The parties may communicate with the Court with respect to this matter by joint letter. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/16/08) (tro)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Christine Tranoutano dated 2/13/08 re: Counsel for plaintiff-petitioner Penrod Management Group write regarding the February 15, 2008 conference at 3:00 P.M. Penrod's representatives are now available to travel from Miami to attend the conference on the afternoon of February 15, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: The hearing on February 15 is the hearing on the Order to show cause for a Preliminary injunction It is not an evidentiary hearing on the ultimate merits. The Court does not expect, but would not preclude the parties from seeking to offer any evidence but that is not common on the return date or an order to show cause for a preliminary injunction which is often decided on the papers. Therefore, the hearing (or oral argument) will proceed on February 15, 2008. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/13/08) (js)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Ryan P. Mulvaney dated 2/7/08 re: counsel requests an adjournment of the conference scheduled for February 14, 2008 at 10:30 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to Friday, February 15, 2008 at 3:00 p.m. So Ordered. ( Status Conference set for 2/15/2008 at 03:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/11/08) (djc)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Cashiers Remark
                                                                            CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [13] Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 12/27/2007, Receipt Number 636958. (jd)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY L.H. Steven Savola PRO HAC VICE. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/19/07) (jco)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk
                                                                                Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: [13] Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jco)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Cashiers Remark
                                                                                  CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [12] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 12/18/2007, Receipt Number 636401. (jd)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer served on James V. Marks on December 21, 2007. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Mills, Richard)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Response to Petition (Other)
                                                                                      RESPONSE to Petition (Other). Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd..(Mills, Richard)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from James V. Marks dated 12/18/07 re: counsel for plaintiff submits motion for admission pro hac vice. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc..(dle)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007, Terminated: 4/3/2008 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                          MOTION for Ryan P. Mulvaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice for defendant. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd. (db)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Brief
                                                                                            BRIEF re: [1] Petition (Other) -- Reply Memo of Law in Further Support of Petition to Enjoin Arbitration. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc..(Marks, James)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Doc
                                                                                              ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney James Vincent Marks to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. [7] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. This document is not filed via ECF. (KA)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007, Terminated: 12/13/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Willie M. Shepherd, # (2) Affidavit James V. Marks, # (3) Exhibit A (proposed order))(Marks, James) Modified on 12/14/2007 (KA).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Brief
                                                                                                  BRIEF re: [1] Petition (Other) in Opposition to Motion via Order to Show Cause to Enjoin Arbitration. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Certification of Counsel in Opposition to Order to Show Cause, # (2) Certification of Counsel - Exhibits A - E, # (3) Certification of Counsel - Exhibits F - H, # (4) Certification of Counsel - Exhibits I - J, # (5) Certification of Counsel - Exhibits K - O, # (6) Certification of Counsel - Exhibit P, # (7) Certification of Counsel - Exhibits Q - W, # (8) Certification of Service)(Mills, Richard)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Richard S. Mills and James V. Marks dated 12/4/2007 re: The undersigned have agreed on a proposed briefing schedule for the above referenced matter. The arbitration date will not be fixed until plaintiffs application for a preliminary injunctions resolved. The following proposed briefing schedule, submitted for Your Honor's approval, is as follows: Proposed Briefing Schedule Defendant's opposition papers submitted on Monday, December 10th, 2007. Plaintiff's reply papers submitted on Monday, December 17, 2007. Hearing on Thursday, December 19, 2007. Both parties thank you for Your Honor's consideration an accommodation in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 12/10/2007, Replies due by 12/17/2007.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/4/2007) (jmi)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance served on James V. Marks on December 5 2007. Document filed by Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd.. (Mills, Richard)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Scott Mills on behalf of Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd. (Mills, Richard)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc.(laq)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Petition - other
                                                                                                            PETITION (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 634516).Document filed by Penrod Management Group Inc.(laq)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                              Case Designated ECF. (laq)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Case Designation
                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton is so designated. (laq)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stewart's Mobile Concepts, Ltd. (laq)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?