Amans v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:21-cv-03577-LHK
District Judge Lucy H. Koh, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 15, 2021 at 3:11 PM DT (2.9 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Matthew Amans, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edelson McGuire LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lily E. Hough +1 415 212 9300 lhough@edelson.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office San Jose
Filed 5/12/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County San Mateo
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ADRMOP
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/15/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/12/2021, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
      LREF
      Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Response
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/30/2021, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: 9/16/2021 Joint Case Management Statement
              JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: 9/16/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 09/16/2021. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                  ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per [22] Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 8/18/2021 to 9/22/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2021. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: 8/12/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                    Case Management Order. The Court consolidates 5:21-cv-05528-LHK, Malek v. Tesla with the 5:21-cv-03577-LHK and 5:21-cv-03681-LHK, Kim v. Tesla. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/12/2021. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021) Modified text on 8/13/2021 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: 8/11/2021 Joint Case Management Statement
                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/22/2021, Entered: 7/22/2021 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of CasesCourt Filing
                        SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of 5:21-cv-03577 LHK with case 5:21-cv-05528 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 7/22/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2021)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: 7/20/2021 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hough, Lily) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: 7/20/2021 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: 7/16/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                              Order Relating Cases. The Court consolidates class action cases 21-cv-03577 and 21-cv-3681. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/16/2021. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2021) Modified text on 7/28/2021 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: 6/30/2021 stipulation
                                STIPULATION re [1] Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to The Complaint filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: 6/8/2021 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Tesla, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: 6/8/2021 Notice of appearance
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Whitty Somvichian (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: 6/8/2021 Notice of appearance
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Soohyun Song (Song, Sharon) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: 6/8/2021 Notice of appearance
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Charniece Pierre (Pierre, Danielle) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: 6/8/2021 Notice of appearance
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Graham Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 waiver of service executed
                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Matthew Amans. Service waived by Tesla, Inc. waiver sent on 5/14/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Hough, Lily) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of CasesCourt Filing
                                              SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 21-cv-03577 LHK with 21-cv-03681 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 5/18/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Clerks Notice
                                                CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH. Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for August 18, 2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh n for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/17/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Matthew Amans (Hough, Lily) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew Amans.. (Hough, Lily) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                          Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                            Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/27/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT against Tesla, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15960368.). Filed byMatthew Amans. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Hough, Lily) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 407 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?