Chemakin v. Chertoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11129-LAP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ilya Chemakin, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones, Fletcher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin William Jones +1 212 334 4577 +1 212 766 2298 kevin@jonesfletcher.com
v.
No Logo Emilio Gonzalez, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Mary Ann Gantner, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert S. Mueller, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 12/10/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 8 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Bronx
Terminated 2/20/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE that the action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to any party. The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed and all pending motions denied as moot. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/20/08) (cd)
    LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Natasha Oeltjen dated 2/8/08 re: Counsel for Defendant requests an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Petitioner's complaint for one week, until 2/15/08. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Michael Chertoff answer due 2/15/2008; Emilio Gonzalez answer due 2/15/2008; Mary Ann Gantner answer due 2/15/2008; Robert S. Mueller answer due 2/15/2008. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/13/08) (tro)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen on behalf of Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Mary Ann Gantner, Robert S. Mueller (Oeltjen, Natasha)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Petition - other
        PETITION FOR HEARING OF NATURALIZATION APPLICATION. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 635405).Document filed by Ilya Chemakin.(laq) (mbe).
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Case Designated ECF.
          Case Designated ECF. (laq)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Summons Issued
            SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Mary Ann Gantner, Robert S. Mueller. (laq)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Case Designation
              Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (laq)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 38 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?