Kim et al v. Tesla, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:21-cv-03681-NC
Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 8, 2021 at 7:45 PM DT (1.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aaron Mandell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahdoot & Wolfson APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ahdoot +3 104 749 1111 +1 310 474 8585 rahdoot@ahdootwolfson.com
Space Tina Wolfson +1 310 474 9111 +1 310 474 8585 twolfson@ahdootwolfson.com
No Logo Alissa Beth Cohen Mandell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahdoot & Wolfson APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ahdoot +3 104 749 1111 +1 310 474 8585 rahdoot@ahdootwolfson.com
Space Tina Wolfson +1 310 474 9111 +1 310 474 8585 twolfson@ahdootwolfson.com
No Logo Anupama Vivek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahdoot & Wolfson APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ahdoot +3 104 749 1111 +1 310 474 8585 rahdoot@ahdootwolfson.com
Space Tina Wolfson +1 310 474 9111 +1 310 474 8585 twolfson@ahdootwolfson.com
No Logo Arpan Patel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahdoot & Wolfson APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ahdoot +3 104 749 1111 +1 310 474 8585 rahdoot@ahdootwolfson.com
Space Tina Wolfson +1 310 474 9111 +1 310 474 8585 twolfson@ahdootwolfson.com
No Logo Jerin Zachariah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahdoot & Wolfson APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ahdoot +3 104 749 1111 +1 310 474 8585 rahdoot@ahdootwolfson.com
Space Tina Wolfson +1 310 474 9111 +1 310 474 8585 twolfson@ahdootwolfson.com
No Logo Mattias Astrom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahdoot & Wolfson APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ahdoot +3 104 749 1111 +1 310 474 8585 rahdoot@ahdootwolfson.com
Space Tina Wolfson +1 310 474 9111 +1 310 474 8585 twolfson@ahdootwolfson.com
No Logo Peter Burns, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahdoot & Wolfson APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ahdoot +3 104 749 1111 +1 310 474 8585 rahdoot@ahdootwolfson.com
Space Tina Wolfson +1 310 474 9111 +1 310 474 8585 twolfson@ahdootwolfson.com
No Logo Sol Kim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahdoot & Wolfson APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ahdoot +3 104 749 1111 +1 310 474 8585 rahdoot@ahdootwolfson.com
Space Tina Wolfson +1 310 474 9111 +1 310 474 8585 twolfson@ahdootwolfson.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office San Jose
Filed 5/17/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Orange
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ADRMOP
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases
                    DISREGARD - Duplicate of Dkt. [7]. Modified on 5/18/2021 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of CasesCourt Filing
                      SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 21-cv-03577 LHK with 21-cv-03681 NC. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 5/18/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Summons issued
                        Summons Issued as to Tesla, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                          Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                            Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/1/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Certificate of Interested Entities
                              Certificate of Interested Entities by Mattias Astrom, Peter Burns, Sol Kim, Aaron Mandell, Alissa Beth Cohen Mandell, Arpan Patel, Anupama Vivek, Jerin Zachariah (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Proposed Summons
                                Proposed Summons. (Wolfson, Tina) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: 5/17/2021 Complaint
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 179 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?