Dymtrow v. Swift et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11277-RJS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 1:05 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Daniel Dymtrow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vivek V. Gupta +1 917 686 4954 +1 646 356 6901 guptaesq@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Norris, McLaughlin & Marcus, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fernando M. Pinguelo +1 908 252 4128 +1 908 722 0755 fmpinguelo@nmmlaw.com
v.
No Logo Andrea Swift, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. LiCalsi +1 917 546 7702 +1 202 509 7239 pvl@msk.com
Space Howard Harvey Weller +1 917 546 7707 +1 917 546 7677 hhw@msk.com
No Logo Scott Swift, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. LiCalsi +1 917 546 7702 +1 202 509 7239 pvl@msk.com
Space Howard Harvey Weller +1 917 546 7707 +1 917 546 7677 hhw@msk.com
No Logo Taylor Swift, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V. LiCalsi +1 917 546 7702 +1 202 509 7239 pvl@msk.com
Space Howard Harvey Weller +1 917 546 7707 +1 917 546 7677 hhw@msk.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 12/14/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
FIRST REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [18] MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint.. Document filed by Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. (Weller, Howard)
    LREF
    Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [18] MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint.. Document filed by Daniel Dymtrow. (Pinguelo, Fernando)
      LREF
      Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
      DECLARATION of Daniel Dymtrow in Opposition re: [18] MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint.. Document filed by Daniel Dymtrow. (Pinguelo, Fernando)
        LREF
        Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Certificate of Service Other
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, Declaration of Howard H. Weller served on Daniel Dymtrow on 4/15/08. Document filed by Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. (Weller, Howard)
          LREF
          Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
          DECLARATION of Howard H. Weller in Support re: [18] MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint.. Document filed by Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Weller, Howard)
            LREF
            Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
            FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [18] MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint. . Document filed by Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. (Weller, Howard)
              LREF
              Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Motion to Dismiss
              MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint. Document filed by Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. Responses due by 5/15/2008(Weller, Howard)
                LREF
                Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard Harvey Weller on behalf of Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift (Weller, Howard)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER at a pre-motion conference held before the Court on April 8, 2008, the following scheduling order was established for Defendants' proposed motion to dismiss: Defendants shall file the motion to dismiss no later than April 15, 2008. Plaintiff shall file his opposition no later than May 15, 2008. Defendants' reply brief, if needed, is due no later than May 22, 2008. If Defendants choose not to file a reply brief, Defendants are directed to send a letter the Court, to be received no later than May 22, 2008, informing the Court that no reply brief will be filed. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 4/15/2008, Responses due by 5/15/2008, Replies due by 5/22/2008.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/8/2008) (jmi)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vivek V. Gupta on behalf of Daniel Dymtrow (Gupta, Vivek)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Paul V. LiCalsi dated 3/27/2008 re: We do not agree with plaintiff's premise that any default has occurred in this case, in that defendants motion was timely filed under the F.R.C.P., and decline to sign plaintiffs proffered order. ENDORSEMENT: The April 11, 2008 Conference will proceed as previously scheduled. Plaintiffs shall submit a letter not to exceed 3 pages by April 3, 2008, responding to the defendants March 21, 2008. Letter and explaining plaintiff's default alleg-action. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/28/2008) (jpo)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Paul V. LiCalsi dated 3/21/08 re: Counsel for Defendants write 1) to apologize to the Court for their inadvertent failure to comply with Your Honor's Individual Practice Rule 2.A requiring a pre-motion conference prior to their filing a motion to dismiss and 2) to belatedly ask for such a conference for defendants' motion which was filed under ECF system on the night of 3/20/08. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff shall respond to this letter by March 28, 2008. The parties shall appear for a pre-motion conference on April 11, 2008 at 11AM. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/11/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/25/08) (tro)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                          ORDER terminating [7] Motion to Dismiss. The Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied without prejudice for failure to comply with the Court's individual practices and the Local Rules of this District. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion docketed as document #7. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/24/2008) (jmi)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                            DECLARATION of Paul V. LiCalsi in Support re: [7] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint.. Document filed by Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B, # (2) Exhibit C-D)(LiCalsi, Paul)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Paul V. LiCalsi in Support re: [7] FIRST MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint. Document filed by Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-D)(LiCalsi, Paul) Modified on 3/21/2008 (jar).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Declaration in Support
                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Paul V. LiCalsi in Support. Document filed by Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. (LiCalsi, Paul) Modified on 3/21/2008 (jar).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
                                  ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Paul V. LiCalsi to RE-FILE Document [10] Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Exhibits must be included as attachments to the document they are supporting. (jar)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
                                    ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Paul LiCalsi to RE-FILE Document [9] Declaration in Support. ERROR(S): Exhibits not attached to the Declaration. (jar)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                      FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss The Complaint. Document filed by Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. (LiCalsi, Paul)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008, Terminated: 3/25/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                        FIRST MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint. Document filed by Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. Responses due by 4/3/2008(LiCalsi, Paul)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Paul V. LiCalsi on behalf of Taylor Swift. New Address: Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP, 12 East 49th Street, 30th Fl, New York, New York, United States 10017, (212) 509-3900. (LiCalsi, Paul)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/11/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. By 4pm on 4/7/08, the parties shall jointly submit a status letter, not to exceed five (5) pages. In addition, the parties are directed to complete the Case Management Plan and Order and submit it to the Court not later than 4pm on 4/7/08. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/12/08) (tro)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Waiver of Service Executed
                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Scott Swift waiver sent on 12/18/2007, answer due 2/16/2008. Document filed by Daniel Dymtrow. (Pinguelo, Fernando)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Andrea Swift waiver sent on 12/18/2007, answer due 2/16/2008. Document filed by Daniel Dymtrow. (Pinguelo, Fernando)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Taylor Swift waiver sent on 12/18/2007, answer due 2/16/2008. Document filed by Daniel Dymtrow. (Pinguelo, Fernando)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT against Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 636117)Document filed by Daniel Dymtrow.(jpo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2007: # (1) Exhibit) (mbe).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Case Designated ECF.
                                                      Case Designated ECF. (jpo)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Case Designation
                                                        Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (jpo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Summons Issued
                                                          SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taylor Swift, Scott Swift, Andrea Swift. (jpo)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 3,397 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?