Vanessa Aders v. Tesla Motors, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Orange, Case No. 30-2021-01201014-CU-BC-CJC

Tags
Last Updated May 19, 2021 at 4:38 PM DT (4.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo VANESSA ADERS, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "TESLA MOTORS, INC."
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/20/2021 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C64 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
    Blank 5 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021
    CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SLAUGHTER, FRED ON 05/13/2021.
      Blank 4 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021
      PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12886814 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12714593.
        Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021
        SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ADERS, VANESSA ON 05/13/2021
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021
          COMPLAINT FILED BY ADERS, VANESSA ON 05/13/2021
            Blank 1 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021
            E-FILING TRANSACTION 41193048 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2021 09:45:07 AM.

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 237 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?