Darel Gene Kyle v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Orange, Case No. 30-2021-01200915-CU-PA-CJC

Tags
Last Updated May 19, 2021 at 4:52 PM DT (4.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAREL GENE KYLE, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/25/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
    Blank 6 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021
    CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARGINES, CHARLES ON 05/12/2021.
      Blank 5 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021
      PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12886561 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12714340.
        Blank 4 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021
        SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KYLE, DAREL GENE ON 05/12/2021
          Blank 3 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021
          CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KYLE, DAREL GENE ON 05/12/2021
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021
            COMPLAINT FILED BY KYLE, DAREL GENE ON 05/12/2021
              Blank 1 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: 5/18/2021
              E-FILING TRANSACTION 31014660 RECEIVED ON 05/12/2021 11:35:16 AM.

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 163 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?