Jarred McGaw v. SinCity Collision Center, LLC
State Civil Lawsuit Eighth Judicial District Court of Clark County, Nevada, Case No. A-21-829299-C

Tags
Last Updated May 21, 2021 at 6:32 PM DT (2.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo McGaw, Jarred, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo SinCity Collision Center, LLC, Defendant
Tesla Motors NV, Inc. Tesla Motors NV, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SinCity Collision Center, LLC, Cross Defendant
Tesla Motors NV, Inc. Tesla Motors NV, Inc., Cross Claimant
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: 7/20/2021 settlement conference
Hearing Time: 9:00 AM
    Blank 14 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: 5/13/2021 Notice
    Notice of Scheduling Settlement Conference
      Blank 13 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: 5/10/2021 ADR - Action Required
      ADR Action Required
        Blank 12 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 Notice Of Entry Of Stipulation And Order
        Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Stay Case
          Blank 11 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: 4/12/2021 Stipulation and Order
          Stipulation and Order to Stay Case - McGaw
            Blank 10 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021 Filing Fee Remittance
            Filing Fee Remittance
              Blank 9 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Demand For Jury Trial
              Tesla Motors NV, Inc.'s Demand for Jury Trial
                Blank 8 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Answer and Crossclaim
                Tesla Motors NV, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint and Cross-Claim
                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure
                  Tesla Motors NV, Inc.'s Initial Appearance Fee Disclosure (NRS Chapter 19)
                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/2/2021, Entered: 3/2/2021 Affidavit of Service
                    Affidavit of Service - SinCity Collision Center
                      Blank 5 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: 2/26/2021 Declaration
                      Declaration of Service - Tesla Motors NV, Inc.
                        Blank 4 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 Summons Electronically Issued - Service Pending
                        Summons - Tesla Motors NV, Inc.
                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 Summons Electronically Issued - Service Pending
                          Summons - SinCity Collision Center, LLC
                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 Statement of Legal Aid Representation and Fee Waiver
                            Statement of Legal Aid Representation (Pursuant to NRS 12.015)
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 Complaint
                              Complaint

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 79 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?