District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

Brimelow v. New York Times Company
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 21-66

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 21, 2021 at 9:20 PM DT (3.8 weeks ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "New York Times Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dana R. Green +1 212 556 3800
Space David Edward McCraw +1 212 556 4031 +1 212 556 4634 mccraw@nytimes.com
No Logo Peter Brimelow, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick C Kelly +1 845 325 6759 fkelly93@yahoo.com
Nature of Suit 4320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=20-cv-222
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=20-cv-222
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208260768 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None ?
NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[3095104] [21-66]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208257587 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None ?
    ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Dana R. Green, Esq. for Appellee New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 05/05/2021 by CM/ECF. [3093912] [21-66]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208241866 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None ?
      ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Frederick C. Kelly, III, Esq. for Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED. Service date 04/27/2021 by CM/ECF. [3088039] [21-66]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 00208241861 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None ?
        REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED. Service date 04/27/2021 by CM/ECF. [3088037] [21-66]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208211956 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None ?
          BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 04/13/2021 by CM/ECF. [3076534] [21-66]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 00208162526 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
            BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED. Service date 03/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3057597] [21-66]
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208162515 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None ?
              JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-191), on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED. Service date 03/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3057590] [21-66]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208153365 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time until 03/16/2021 to file the brief and appendix, absent opposition [27] filed by Appellant Peter Brimelow, by JAC, FILED. [3054001][31] [21-66]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208145400 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None ?
                  MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED. Service date 03/08/2021 by CM/ECF. [3050953] [21-66]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208083912 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                    LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 03/09/2021, appellee's brief due date as 04/13/2021, TRANSMITTED.[3027401] [21-66]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208083792 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                      NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[3027360] [21-66]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                        ATTORNEY, Dana R. Green for New York Times Company, in case 21-66, [17], ADDED.[3025753] [21-66]
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208078986 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF.[3025503] [21-66]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208078967 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee New York Times Company, FILED. Service date 01/29/2021 by CM/ECF. [3025493] [21-66]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                              CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [13], [14], on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED.[3021920] [21-66]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208069600 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED. Service date 01/26/2021 by email.[3021905] [21-66]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208069431 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance, [9], on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED.[3021839] [21-66]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208068515 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                    FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED. Service date 01/26/2021 by email.[3021494] [21-66]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208068503 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                      FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED. Service date 01/26/2021 by email.[3021489] [21-66]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None ?
                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED. Service date 01/26/2021 by email.[3021485] [21-66]
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None ?
                                          NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Frederick Charles Kelly, Esq. for Appellant Peter Brimelow, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[3012728] [21-66]
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208045981 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                                            ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3012724] [21-66]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                                              PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, USCA receipt # ANYSDC23474574, FILED.[3012722] [21-66]
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208045963 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/06/2021, RECEIVED.[3012719] [21-66]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208045959 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                  DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/16/2020, RECEIVED.[3012717] [21-66]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00208045926 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                    NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Peter Brimelow, FILED. [3012705] [21-66]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?