District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  1. Case No. 20-17285
    Filed 11/20/2020
  2. Case No. 21-15813
    Filed 5/4/2021
  3. Case No. 21-15822
    Filed 5/6/2021
United States Supreme Court

CoreCivic, Inc. v. Candide Group, LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 21-15813

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 22, 2021 at 12:09 AM DT (3.8 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Candide Group, Llc, Defendant - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Selina MacLaren +1 213 633 8617 selinamaclaren@dwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Burke +1 415 276 6500 +1 415 276 6599 thomasburke@dwt.com
No Logo Morgan Simon, Defendant - Appellant,

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas R. Burke +1 415 276 6500 +1 415 276 6599 thomasburke@dwt.com
Space Selina MacLaren +1 213 633 8617 selinamaclaren@dwt.com
CoreCivic, Inc. CoreCivic, Inc., Plaintiff - Appellee,

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Megan A. Meier (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Marie Locke +1 202 628 7402 libby@clarelocke.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Newmeyer & Dillon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Brandon McClellan +1 949 854 7000 +1 949 854 7099 michael.mcclellan@ndlf.com
Space Chanmaly Kendie Schlecht +1 949 854 7000 +1 949 854 7099 kendie.schlecht@ndlf.com
Nature of Suit 3320 - Assault Libel and Slander
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:20-cv-03792-WHA
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=3:20-cv-03792-WHA
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032728956 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None ?
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None ?
    The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/13/2021.
    To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following link.
    Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12112006]. [21-15813] (AD)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032712653 Filed: 5/13/2021, Entered: None ?
      Filed (ECF) Appellant CoreCivic, Inc. in 21-15822, Appellee CoreCivic, Inc. in 21-15813 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/13/2021. [12111782] [21-15822, 21-15813] (Locke, Elizabeth)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None ?
        The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/11/2021.
        To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following link.
        Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12109886]. [21-15813] (AD)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032707380 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None ?
          Filed (ECF) Appellants Candide Group, LLC and Morgan Simon in 21-15813 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/11/2021. [12109465] [21-15813, 21-15822] (Burke, Thomas)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032696643 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None ?
            DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellant CoreCivic, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/13/2021. First cross appeal brief due 08/11/2021 for Candide Group, LLC and Morgan Simon. Second brief on cross appeal due 09/13/2021 for CoreCivic, Inc.. Third brief on cross appeal due 10/13/2021 for Candide Group, LLC and Morgan Simon. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for CoreCivic, Inc. is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [12104530] [21-15822, 21-15813] (RT)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 009032690358 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None ?
              DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Candide Group, LLC and Morgan Simon Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/11/2021. Transcript ordered by 06/02/2021. Transcript due 07/02/2021. Appellants Candide Group, LLC and Morgan Simon opening brief due 08/11/2021. Appellee CoreCivic, Inc. answering brief due 09/13/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12101388] (RT)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 6 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?