Travette Vasser v. SaarGummi Tennessee
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, Case No. 20-5223

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 23, 2021 at 2:12 AM DT (3.6 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Saargummi Tennessee, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcus Marion Crider +1 615 244 6380
No Logo Travette Vasser, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Travette Vasser +1 615 956 8716
Nature of Suit 3442 - Civil Rights: Jobs
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.tnmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:18-cv-00083
Lower Court Case https://ecf.tnmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:18-cv-00083
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014383917 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: None ?
REPLY BRIEF filed by Party Mr. Travette Vasser Certificate of Service:05/13/2021. (RLJ)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014371089 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None ?
    RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [23] filed by Mr. Travette Vasser., setting reply brief deadline: reply brief due 05/13/2021. (RLJ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014370304 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None ?
      Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Travette Vasser to extend time to file REPLY brief. Certificate of service: 04/29/2021. (RLJ)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014346909 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None ?
        APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Marcus Marion Crider for SaarGummi Tennessee. Certificate of Service: 04/05/2021. Argument Request: not requested. [20-5223] (MMC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None ?
          Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014320802 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None ?
            APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Travette Vasser Certificate of Service:03/05/2021. Argument Request: pro se. (RLJ)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014305438 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None ?
              MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation conference has been rescheduled for 03/09/2021 at 10:00 AM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014305263 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None ?
                RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to file brief, resetting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/05/2021. appellee brief now due 04/05/2021. (RLJ)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014299705 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None ?
                  BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 02/16/2021. appellee brief now due 03/22/2021. (LMR)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014294184 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None ?
                    MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/01/2021 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (LMR)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: None ?
                      Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (LMR)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014261619 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                        BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/11/2021; appellee brief due 03/16/2021. (RLJ)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014261610 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                          ORDER filed granting motion to reinstate case [12] filed by Mr. Travette Vasser. (RLJ)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014260740 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Appellant MOTION filed by Mr. Travette Vasser to reinstate case. Certificate of service: 12/29/2020. Note: certain portions of this document have been removed to preserve sensitive information that is not appropriate for public viewing. (RLJ)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Update fee status change to paid. RECEIPT #34675060871 in the amount of $505.00 posted by Travette Vasser re 22 Notice of Appeal. (RLJ)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014235736 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                ORDER filed to dismiss for want of prosecution - failure to pay filing fee on or before 11/02/20. (RLJ)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014179431 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014033162 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Financial Affidavit filed by Party Travette Vasser Certificate of Service: 04/21/2020. (RLJ)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014033159 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Appellant MOTION filed by Travette Vasser to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 04/21/2020. (RLJ)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014004821 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Marcus Marion Crider for Appellee SaarGummi Tennessee Certificate of Service: 03/23/2020. [20-5223] (MMC)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014004815 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          APPEARANCE filed for Appellee SaarGummi Tennessee by Marcus M. Crider. Certificate of Service: 03/23/2020. [20-5223] (MMC)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014004806 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            RULING LETTER SENT to extend time to pay fee $505 to district court or renew motion for pauper status with the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals on or before 04/22/20 (forms enclosed). (RLJ)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006014004536 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Copy of District Court Order filed 03/05/20 denying in forma pauperis - granting 28 days within which for Ms. Vasser to pay the $505 filing fee (up to and including 4/2/20). (RLJ)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 006013983088 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Travette Vasser. Transcript needed: n. (RLJ)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?