Superior Appellate Supreme
State
Superior Court of California, County of San Mateo California Court of Appeals
  1. Case No. A154463
    Filed 5/31/2018
  2. Case No. A155840
    Filed 11/14/2018
CA Supreme Court

Zilincik v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit California Court of Appeals, Case No. A155840

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zilincik, Scott E, Plaintiff and Appellant
Officially listed as "Scott Zilincik"
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant and Appellant
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 55 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021
Filed proof of service.: for Application for Extension of Time to File X-ARB
    Blank 54 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021
    Filed declaration of: Declaration for Application for Extension of Time to File X-ARB
      Blank 53 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: 4/27/2021
      Granted - extension of time.: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 06/09/2021 By 30 Day(s)
        Blank 52 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021
        Requested - extension of time.: Appellant's reply brief. Requested for 06/09/2021 By 30 Day(s)
          Blank 51 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: 2/10/2021
          Appellant's reply brief. Due on 05/10/2021 By 62 Day(s): ***No further extension will be granted.***
            Blank 50 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021
            Granted - extension of time.: ***No further extension will be granted.***
              Blank 49 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021
              Filed proof of service.: for Application for Extension of Time to File X-ARB
                Blank 48 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021
                Requested - extension of time.: Appellant's reply brief. Requested for 05/10/2021 By 62 Day(s)
                  Blank 47 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021
                  Augmentation granted. (See order.): Defendant's unopposed motion to augment the record filed on December 9, 2020, is granted and the record on appeal is augmented to include those proceedings itemized within the motion, which is attached and incorporated by reference.
                    Blank 46 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020
                    To court.: Appellant Tesla Inc.'s Motion to Augment the Record on Appeal (RT attached)
                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020
                      Appellant's reply brief.: Defendant and Appellant: Tesla, Inc. Attorney: James R. Hancock Attorney: Miriam A. Vogel Attorney: Sean P. Gates (ARB & X-RB)
                        Blank 44 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020
                        Appellant's appendix filed.: Appellant's Reply/Cross-Respondent's Appendix (pp. ARA1-ARA287)
                          Blank 43 Filed: 12/9/2020, Entered: 12/9/2020
                          Motion/application to augment record filed.: Appellant Tesla Inc.'s Motion to Augment the Record on Appeal (RT attached)
                            Blank 42 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: 11/24/2020
                            Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.: Defendant and Appellant: Tesla, Inc. Attorney: James R. Hancock Attorney: Miriam A. Vogel Attorney: Sean P. Gates
                              Blank 41 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                              Filed proof of service.: 1) Respondents' Brief and Cross-Appellants' Opening Brief 2) Respondents' Appendix Volume 1, 2, 3
                                Blank 40 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                                Respondent's appendix filed.: Respondents' Appendix Volume 3 of 3
                                  Blank 39 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                                  Respondent's appendix filed.: Respondents' Appendix Volume 2 of 3
                                    Blank 38 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                                    Respondent's appendix filed.: Respondents' Appendix Volume 1 of 3
                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                                      Respondent's brief.: Plaintiff and Appellant: Scott Zilincik Attorney: Ruth Israely (RB & X-AOB)Three extensions granted for a total of 211 days: 01/02/2020 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 04/08/2020 By 90 Day(s) 01/03/2020 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/08/2020 By 90 Day(s) 03/20/2020 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 07/07/2020 By 90 Day(s) 04/10/2020 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/07/2020 By 90 Day(s) 06/16/2020 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 08/07/2020 By 31 Day(s) 06/17/2020 Granted - extension of time. Due on 08/07/2020 By 31 Day(s)
                                        Blank 36 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                        Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.: Plaintiff and Appellant: Scott Zilincik Attorney: Ruth Israely Attorney: Yosef Peretz
                                          Blank 35 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020
                                          Granted - extension of time.: *** No further extensions are likely to be granted. ***
                                            Blank 34 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020
                                            Requested - extension of time.
                                              Blank 33 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: 4/10/2020
                                              Granted - extension of time.: ***Further extensions will not likely be granted.***
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020
                                                Granted - extension of time.: ***Further extensions will not likely be granted.***
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020
                                                  Requested - extension of time.
                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020
                                                    Granted - extension of time.
                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020
                                                      Filed proof of service.: to EOT for RB
                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020
                                                        Requested - extension of time.
                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019
                                                          Request for judicial notice granted.: Defendant's unopposed request for judicial notice filed on October 11, 2019, is granted. The court will take judicial notice of the records designated in the attached request, which is incorporated by reference.
                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019
                                                            To court.: Appellant's Request for Judicial Notice
                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019
                                                              Request for judicial notice filed.: Appellant
                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019
                                                                Exhibits lodged.: 16 Volumes Appellant's Appendix on USB Thumb Drive (from Sean P. Gates, counsel for Tesla, Inc.) (filed under A154463; placed in grey exhibit envelope)
                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019
                                                                  Appellant's opening brief.: Defendant and Appellant: Tesla, Inc. Attorney: James R. Hancock Attorney: Miriam A. Vogel Attorney: Sean P. Gates
                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019
                                                                    Filed document entitled: Appellant Tesla's Notice of Lodging and Service of Appellant's Appendix on USB Thumb Drive (16 Volumes)
                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019
                                                                      Filed declaration of: Declaration of Miriam A. Vogel in Support of Application for Extension for Opening Brief
                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                        Granted - extension of time.
                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                          Requested - extension of time.: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 10/11/2019 By 30 Day(s)
                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019
                                                                            Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.: Plaintiff and Appellant: Scott Zilincik Attorney: Ruth Israely Attorney: Yosef Peretz
                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019
                                                                              Attorney address changed.: Charis Lex P.C., firm for appellant Tesla Inc.
                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019
                                                                                Change of contact information filed for: Sean P. Gates old address 1: 16 N. Marengo Ave., Suite 300 new address 1: 301 N Lake Ave., Suite 1100
                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019
                                                                                  Record on appeal filed.: R-1(e-filed)
                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019
                                                                                    Civil case information statement filed.: Plaintiff and Appellant: Scott Zilincik Attorney: Yosef Peretz Yosef Peretz, attorney for appellant Zilincik, w/order attached
                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019
                                                                                      Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.
                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019
                                                                                        Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on: Filed 01/03/18. Designating 8.124 **Respondents and Cross-Appellants Scott Zilincik et al.**
                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019
                                                                                          Filed order consolidating with case: as stipulated so ordered case numbers A154463, A154464, A155819, A155839, and A155840 are consolidated for purposes of record, briefing, oral argument and decision
                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018
                                                                                            Stipulation filed to: Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals (A154463, A154464, A155819, A155839, and A155840)(to court)
                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018
                                                                                              Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.: Filed 12/11/18. Due Date 01/10/19
                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: 12/19/2018
                                                                                                Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated: 12/11/18. ***Cross-Appeal***
                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018
                                                                                                  Civil case information statement filed.: Defendant and Appellant: Tesla, Inc. Attorney: James R. Hancock Sean P. Gates attorney for appellant Tesla, Inc. with attached order
                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018
                                                                                                    Filing fee.: **Cross-Appeal** Check # 12375, Swift Attorney Services for Plaintiff Scott Zilincik.
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018
                                                                                                      Notice of appeal lodged/received.: Filed *** Cross-Appeal*** 11/16/18 by Yosef Peretz as counsel for Plaintiff, Scott Zilincik from judgment entered 11-07-18
                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018
                                                                                                        Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on: 11-14-18 designating 8.124 WITH RT
                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018
                                                                                                          Filing fee.: check #99065864 - Morrison & Foerster LLP
                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018
                                                                                                            Notified parties of local rules and procedures.
                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018
                                                                                                              Notice of appeal lodged/received.: Filed 11-14-18 by Sean P. Gates as counsel for Defendant, Tesla Motors, Inc.

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?