Thompson v. Tesla Motors Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 3:21-cv-00238-HDM-WGC
District Judge Howard D. McKibben, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2021 at 1:31 PM DT (3.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Thompson, Lynn, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Lynn Thompson"

Toggle Switch Represented by Watkins & Letofsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Anthony DiRenzo +1 702 901 7533 +1 702 974 1297 mdirenzo@wl-llp.com
Space R. Samuel Ehlers +1 702 974 1297 sehlers@wl-llp.com
Space Daniel Ray Watkins +1 949 476 9400 +1 949 476 9407 jdivincenzo@wl-llp.com
v.
No Logo OnQ Global Inc. , Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc"
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: 9/8/2021 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
ORDER granting ECF No. [9] Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Tesla shall have a 14-day extension up to and including Tuesday, September 21, 2021, in which to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/23/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: 9/7/2021, Terminated: 9/8/2021 stipulation
      STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re [1] Complaint,, by Defendant Tesla Motors Inc. (Sliker, Joshua)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/18/2021, Entered: 8/18/2021 summons returned executed
        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Thompson re [2] Summons Issued. Tesla Motors Inc served on 8/17/2021. (Watkins, Daniel)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 waiver of service executed
          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lynn Thompson re [2] Summons Issued. OnQ Global Inc. waiver sent on 8/16/2021, answer due 10/15/2021. (Watkins, Daniel)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: 6/7/2021 Certificate of Interested Parties
            CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lynn Thompson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (DiRenzo, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: 6/7/2021 Minute OrderCourt Filing
              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/7/2021. Counsel for plaintiff shall have a period of ten (10) calendar days (6/17/2021) from the filing date of this order within which to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Assign Judges in Civil Case
                Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for ENE. (LE)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Assign Judges in Civil Case
                  Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin for ENE. (LE)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER Transferring Case to Unofficial Northern Division. The Clerk will transfer this case and reopen as a new matter under a new docket number and this action will be closed without prejudice to the plaintiff with regard to the filing fee. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Assign Judges in Civil Case
                      Case randomly assigned to Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (LE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Standing OrderCourt Filing
                        STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Summons issued
                          Summons Issued as to OnQ Global Inc., Tesla Motors Inc. (JQC)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6495431) by Lynn Thompson. Proof of service due by 8/19/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons As to OnQ Global Inc, # (3) Summons As to Tesla) (Watkins, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Assign Judges in Civil Case
                              Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 261 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?