NEIMA BENAVIDES, Personal Representative of the Estate of NAIBEL BENAVIDES LEON, deceased v. Tesla, Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-21940-BB
District Judge Beth Bloom, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 10, 2021 at 3:27 PM DT (2.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NEIMA BENAVIDES, Personal Representative of the Estate of NAIBEL BENAVIDES LEON, deceased, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by posesandposes.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd Poses +1 305 577 0200 +1 305 577 0200 tposes@posesandposes.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cole, Scott & Kissane, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HENRY SALAS Henry.Salas@csklegal.com
Office Miami
Filed 5/25/2021
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Miami-Dade (Office - Miami)
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 21-009715-CA-01[11th Judicial Circuit Court Miami-Dade]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag AOR
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/10/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None ORDER Scheduling Mediation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/7/2021, Entered: None Consent to Mediation
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2021, Entered: None SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling ReportCourt Filing
                      ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/15/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 Answer to Complaint
                        ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tesla, Inc. (Salas, Henry)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 Clerk's Notice of Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                          Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)
                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-14711350, payment transferred from : 21cv21931, filed by Tesla, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Summons and Complaint, # (2) Exhibit Notice of State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, # (3) Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Salas, Henry) (No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed)Modified text on 5/25/2021 (jbs).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 158 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?