Alexandro Filippini et al v. Tesla Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Barbara, Case No. 20CV01141

Tags
Last Updated May 26, 2021 at 1:05 AM DT (3.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Filippini, Alexandro, Plaintiff
No Logo Filippini, Iaian, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 76 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 Minute Order
Minute Order
    Blank 75 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 Motion to Strike
    Original Type: Motion: Strike; Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Second Amended Complaint
      Blank 74 Filed: 7/19/2021, Entered: 7/19/2021 Demurrer
      Original Type: Demurrer; Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to Second Amended Complaint
        Legal Document 73 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Reply
        ISO Motion to Strike Second Amended Complaint
          Legal Document 72 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: 7/12/2021 Reply
          ISO Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint
            Legal Document 71 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: 6/21/2021 Minute Order
            CMC Con't to 10-25-2021
              Blank 70 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: 6/21/2021 Case Management Conference
              Original Type: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held
                Legal Document 69 Filed: 6/8/2021, Entered: 6/8/2021 Case Management Statement
                Case Management Statement
                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: 6/7/2021 Case Management Statement
                  Case Management Statement
                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Opposition
                    Opposition
                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Declaration
                      Declaration
                        Legal Document 65 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: 5/24/2021 Opposition
                        Opposition
                          Blank 64 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: 5/19/2021 Association Of Attorney
                          Association of Attorney/Counsel
                            Legal Document 63 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Motion
                            Motion
                              Legal Document 62 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Request For Judicial Notice
                              Request for Judicial Notice
                                Legal Document 61 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Declaration
                                Declaration of Demurring Party CCP 430.41(a)
                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: 5/3/2021 Demurrer
                                  Demurrer
                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021 Amended Complaint
                                    Amended Complaint
                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021
                                      Minute Order
                                        Blank 57 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Case Management Conference
                                        Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K; Hearing Time; 10:00 AM; Result: Held
                                          Blank 56 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Motion
                                          Motion: Strike: Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held
                                            Blank 55 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021 Demurrer
                                            Demurrer: Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held
                                              Blank 54 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021 Objection
                                              Objection
                                                Blank 53 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: 3/1/2021 Reply
                                                Reply
                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: 2/23/2021 Case Management Statement
                                                  Case Management Statement
                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                    Request for Judicial Notice
                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Declaration
                                                      Declaration
                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021 Opposition
                                                        Opposition
                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: 2/18/2021 Case Management Statement
                                                          Case Management Statement
                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 Minute Order
                                                            Minute Order
                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021 Case Management Conference
                                                              Case Management Conference
                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 Case Management Statement
                                                                Case Management Statement
                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021 Case Management Statement
                                                                  Case Management Statement
                                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: 12/24/2020 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                    Request for Judicial Notice
                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: 12/24/2020 Motion
                                                                      Motion
                                                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: 12/24/2020 Declaration
                                                                        Declaration
                                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: 12/24/2020 Demurrer
                                                                          Demurrer
                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Order
                                                                            Order
                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 Stipulation
                                                                              Stipulation
                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020 Minute Order
                                                                                Minute Order
                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020 Motion: Relief
                                                                                  Motion: Relief
                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 Order
                                                                                    Order: Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K
                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 Stipulation
                                                                                      Stipulation
                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020 Declaration
                                                                                        Declaration
                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020 Motion
                                                                                          Motion
                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                            Amended Complaint
                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: 8/12/2020 Order
                                                                                              Order: Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K
                                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Minute Order
                                                                                                Minute Order
                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Notice Of Ruling
                                                                                                  Notice of Ruling
                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Case Management Conference
                                                                                                    Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Motion
                                                                                                      Motion: Strike: Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held
                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020 Demurrer
                                                                                                        Demurrer: Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held
                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Reply
                                                                                                          Reply
                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Reply
                                                                                                            Reply
                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                              Declaration
                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Opposition
                                                                                                                Opposition
                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                  Declaration
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Opposition
                                                                                                                    Opposition
                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 Minute Order
                                                                                                                      Minute Order
                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                        Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Sterne, Colleen K; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held
                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                          Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Notice Of Posting Of Jury Fees
                                                                                                                            Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: 6/15/2020 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                Declaration
                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                  Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Notice Of Demurrer And Demurrer
                                                                                                                                    Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                      Order
                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: 5/13/2020 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                        Stipulation
                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                          Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: 2/28/2020 Notice of Case Assignment
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                              Declaration
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                Declaration
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum
                                                                                                                                                  Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form)
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                    Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        Complaint

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 858 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?