Dershowitz v. Netflix, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-21961-CMA
District Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 11, 2021 at 11:50 AM DT (6.1 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan Dershowitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean Alexander Burstyn +1 917 810 8450 Sean.Burstyn@BurstynLaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 208

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jesse Dean-Kluger +1 305 534 3460 +1 786 206 3075 jdk@jdkpa.com
v.
No Logo Joseph Berlinger, Defendant
No Logo Leroy & Morton Productions LLC, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Bryant, Defendant
Netflix, Inc. Netflix, Inc., Defendant
No Logo @radical.media LLC, Defendant
Office Miami
Filed 5/26/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Miami-Dade (Office - Miami)
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag EGT
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Summons Issued
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Bar Letter
              Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Sean A. Burstyn, mailing date May 26, 2021, (pt)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es)
                Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Summons was made out to all defendants. A summons needs to be prepared for each individual defendant. (drz)
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case
                  Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Clerk's Notice of Judge AssignmentCourt Filing
                    Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT And Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14717340, filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summon(s))(Dean-Kluger, Jesse)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 82 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?