Lin et al v. Mukasey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00022-DLC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shao Chang Lin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of Yee Ling Poon, Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yee Ling Poon +1 212 385 4575 +1 212 385 4792 info@ylpoonlaw.com
No Logo Xiu Lan Lin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of Yee Ling Poon, Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yee Ling Poon +1 212 385 4575 +1 212 385 4792 info@ylpoonlaw.com
No Logo Yu Cai Zhang, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of Yee Ling Poon, Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yee Ling Poon +1 212 385 4575 +1 212 385 4792 info@ylpoonlaw.com
No Logo Zhen Xing Lin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office Of Yee Ling Poon, Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yee Ling Poon +1 212 385 4575 +1 212 385 4792 info@ylpoonlaw.com
v.
No Logo David L. Neal, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Emilio Gonzales, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Juan Osuna, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kevin Ohlson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert D. Mueller, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Susan Raufer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 1/2/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County XX Out of State
Terminated 2/25/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: that the above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to any party. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/25/08) (tro)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
    ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Yee Ling Poon for noncompliance with Section (3) of the S.D.N.Y. 3rd Amended Instructions For Filing An Electronic Case or Appeal and Section 1(d) of the S.D.N.Y. Procedures For Electronic Case Filing. E-MAIL the PDF for Document [1] Complaint, to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (tro)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen on behalf of Susan Raufer, Robert D. Mueller, III, Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Kevin Ohlson, Juan Osuna, David L. Neal, Emilio Gonzales (Oeltjen, Natasha)
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against Susan Raufer, Robert D. Mueller, III, Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Kevin Ohlson, Juan Osuna, David L. Neal, Emilio Gonzales. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 637124)Document filed by Zhen Xing Lin, Shao Chang Lin, Xiu Lan Lin, Yu Cai Zhang.(mbe)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Case Designated ECF.
          Case Designated ECF. (mbe)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Case Designation
            Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (mbe)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
              SUMMONS ISSUED as to Susan Raufer, Robert D. Mueller, III, Michael B. Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Kevin Ohlson, Juan Osuna, David L. Neal, Emilio Gonzales, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mbe)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 92 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?