L. Lin Wood v. Paula Frederick, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 21-11649

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 29, 2021 at 11:54 AM DT (2.7 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Casey Carter Santas, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Nish Arndt +1 678 608 1713
Space Robert L. Goldstucker +1 404 522 2200 bgoldstucker@nallmiller.com
No Logo Connie S. Cooper, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Nish Arndt +1 678 608 1713
Space Robert L. Goldstucker +1 404 522 2200 bgoldstucker@nallmiller.com
No Logo Jeffrey R. Harris, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Nish Arndt +1 678 608 1713
Space Robert L. Goldstucker +1 404 522 2200 bgoldstucker@nallmiller.com
No Logo Patricia F. Ammari, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Nish Arndt +1 678 608 1713
Space Robert L. Goldstucker +1 404 522 2200 bgoldstucker@nallmiller.com
No Logo Paula J. Frederick, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Nish Arndt +1 678 608 1713
Space Robert L. Goldstucker +1 404 522 2200 bgoldstucker@nallmiller.com
No Logo L. Lin Wood, Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ibrahim Reyes +1 305 218 0982 +1 305 445 1181 ireyes@reyeslawyers.com
Space Larry L. Crain
Space L. Lin Wood +1 678 773 7030
Nature of Suit 3440 - Civil Rights: Other
Case Type Private Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.gand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:21-cv-01169-TCB
Lower Court Case https://ecf.gand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:21-cv-01169-TCB
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 011011762841 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None ?
APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert L. Goldstucker for Patricia F. Ammari, Connie S. Cooper, Paula J. Frederick, Jeffrey R. Harris and Casey Carter Santas. [21-11649] (ECF: Robert Goldstucker)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 011011762830 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None ?
    APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Patrick Nish Arndt for Patricia F. Ammari, Connie S. Cooper, Paula J. Frederick, Jeffrey R. Harris and Casey Carter Santas. [21-11649] (ECF: Patrick Arndt)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 011011761740 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None ?
      Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Larry L. Crain for L. Lin Wood is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 011011761731 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None ?
        Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Ibrahim Reyes for L. Lin Wood is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and submit the required application for admission.
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 011011761465 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None ?
          APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Larry L. Crain for L. Lin Wood. [21-11649] (ECF: L. Lin Wood)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 011011761423 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None ?
            APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by L. Lin Wood for L. Lin Wood. [21-11649] (ECF: L. Lin Wood)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 011011761410 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None ?
              APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Ibrahim Reyes for L. Lin Wood. [21-11649] (ECF: L. Lin Wood)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None ?
                Public Communication: L. Lin Wood - Counsel who wish to participate in this appeal must complete and electronically file an appearance of counsel form. Appearance of counsel forms are available on the court's website. The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6.
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 011011761019 Filed: 5/24/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney L. Lin Wood for Appellant L. Lin Wood. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11649] (ECF: L. Lin Wood)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 011011748557 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Appellate fee was paid on 05/10/2021 as to Appellant L. Lin Wood.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 011011748545 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                      CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant L. Lin Wood on 05/10/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/21/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/24/2021 as to Appellant L. Lin Wood. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/07/2021 as to Appellee Paula J. Frederick
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 7 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?