Saleh v. Quarantillo et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00076-SAS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ameen Nagi Saleh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Romben Estrada Aquino +1 212 966 7775 +1 212 966 0338 rombenesque@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Andrea J. Quarantillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 1/4/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, ECF
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
DECLARATION of Romben Aquino in Support re: [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Ameen Nagi Saleh. (Aquino, Romben)
    LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Romben Aquino in Support re: [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Ameen Nagi Saleh. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit N-400 Application - part1, # (2) Exhibit N-400 Application part2, # (3) Exhibit Alien Registration Card, # (4) Exhibit USCIS decision 5/31/2007, # (5) Exhibit USCIS Decision 12/20/2007, # (6) Exhibit Dispositions of Arrest, # (7) Exhibit Affidavits, # (8) Exhibit Deposition Transcript - Saleh)(Aquino, Romben) Modified on 8/28/2008 (jar).
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Rule 56.1 Statement
      RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Ameen Nagi Saleh. (Aquino, Romben)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Affirmation in Support of Motion
        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (RULE 56.1 STATEMENT) - AFFIRMATION of Romben Aquino in Support re: [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Ameen Nagi Saleh. (Aquino, Romben) Modified on 8/28/2008 (jar).
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Ameen Nagi Saleh. (Aquino, Romben)
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
            MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Ameen Nagi Saleh. Responses due by 9/26/2008(Aquino, Romben)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient D
              ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Romben Aquino to RE-FILE Document [15] Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Attorney's signature missing from document. (jar)
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: 6/23/08 the date by which plaintiff will supply its pre-trial order matters to defendant. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2008 at 04:00 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Pretrial Order due by 7/7/2008. the anticipated length of this trial will be one day and it will be a court trial. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/27/08) (mme)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Rornben Aquino dated 4/1/2008 re: Counsel for Plaintiff write to request an adjournment sin date of the settlement conference that has been scheduled for Monday, April 7, 2008 at 2:00 pm. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. ( Settlement Conference set for 4/7/2008 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 4/1/2008) (jmi)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Response to Petition (Other)
                    RESPONSE to Petition (Other). Document filed by Andrea J. Quarantillo, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services.(Oeltjen, Natasha)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER, that a settlement conference has been scheduled on Monday, 4/7/08, at 2:00 pm. ( Settlement Conference set for 4/7/2008 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 2/25/08) Copies sent by chambers.(cd)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/19/2008. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2008 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Pretrial Order due by 6/16/2008. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/19/2008) (jmi)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                          ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. SO ORDERED. April would Be Best. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/19/2008) (jmi)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 Note Regarding Deleted Document
                            ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [6] Order of Reference (duplicate of Entry No. 4). The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                              ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/19/2008 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/29/08) (tro)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen on behalf of Andrea J. Quarantillo, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services (Oeltjen, Natasha)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Petition - other
                                  PETITION REVIEW OF NATURALIZATION DENIAL. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 637322).Document filed by Ameen Nagi Saleh.(jmi) (mbe).
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                                    Case Designated ECF. (jmi)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Case Designation
                                      Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (jmi)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Summons Issued
                                        SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrea J. Quarantillo, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services. (jmi)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?