Hosseinzadeh v. Mukasey et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00176-DAB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shala Hosseinzadeh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ix.netcom.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Edward Moseley +1 973 622 8176 +1 973 645 9493 moselaw@ix.netcom.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Emilio Gonzalez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Micheal Mukasey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Paul Novak, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert Mueller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 1/9/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County NewYork
Terminated 3/26/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to either party. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 3/26/2008) (jpo)
    LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Kirti Vaidya Reddy dated 3/10/08 re: Defendant United States Citizenship & Immigration Services requests a 60 day extension until 5/9/08 to respond to the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. United States Citizenship & Immigration Services answer due 5/9/2008. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 3/11/08) (db)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of Federal Bureau of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency, Micheal Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak, Robert Mueller, Michael Hayden, Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services (Reddy, Kirti)
        LREF
        Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency, Micheal Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak, Robert Mueller, Michael Hayden, Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 637792)Document filed by Shala Hosseinzadeh.(jeh) (laq).
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
          ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Thomas Edward Moseley for noncompliance with Section (3) of the S.D.N.Y. 3rd Amended Instructions For Filing An Electronic Case or Appeal and Section 1(d) of the S.D.N.Y. Procedures For Electronic Case Filing. E-MAIL the PDF for Document [1] Complaint, to: case_openings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (jeh)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Case Designation
            Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton is so designated. (jeh)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Case Designated ECF.
              Case Designated ECF. (jeh)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Summons Issued
                SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, Central Intelligence Agency, Micheal Mukasey, Michael Chertoff, Emilio Gonzalez, Paul Novak, Robert Mueller, Michael Hayden, Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship & Immigration Services. (jeh)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 117 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?