LEE, SUE v. PUBLIC COMPANY ACCOUNTING OVERSIGHT BOARD et al JP
State Civil Lawsuit District of Columbia Superior Court, Case No. 2021 CA 000704 B

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 4, 2021 at 4:30 PM DT (1.8 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lee, Sue, Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Entegris, Inc.
v.
No Logo DUHNKE, III, WILLIAM D, Defendant
No Logo Public Company Accounting Oversight Board, Defendant
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None
Notice of Removal e-Pak transmitted to the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia 5/21/2021. kc.
    Blank 12 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None
    Notice of Hearing Mailed Next Business Day Notice Of Removal Sent on: 05/21/2021 10:50:39.42
      Blank 11 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None Court Filing
      Event Resulted: The following event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 9:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: Event Not Held Case Dismissed Judge: PARK, JASON Location: Courtroom 519
        Blank 10 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None
        Notice of Removal to USDC Filed. 1:21-cv-1006.
          Blank 9 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None
          Additional eFiling Document to Notice of Removal to USDC Filed submitted 04/12/2021 14:35pm. ae Attorney: LORENGER, Mr MICHAEL J (454146)
            Blank 8 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None
            Notice of Removal to USDC Filed submitted 04/12/2021 14:35pm. ae Attorney: LORENGER, Mr MICHAEL J (454146)
              Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: None
              Initial Summons Requested as to: PUBLIC COMPANY ACCOUNTING OVERSIGHT BOARD (Defendant);
                Blank 6 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None
                Issue Date: 03/11/2021 Service: Summons Issued Method: Service Issued Cost Per: $ DUHNKE III, WILLIAM D 11687 Chanceford Drive WOODBRIDGE, VA 22192 Tracking No: 5000232752
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/11/2021, Entered: None
                  Initial Summons Requested as to: WILLIAM D DUHNKE III (Defendant);
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None
                    Issue Date: 03/08/2021 Service: Summons Issued Method: Service Issued Cost Per: $ PUBLIC COMPANY ACCOUNTING OVERSIGHT BOARD Kenneth R. Lench, Esq. General Counsel 1666 K Street NW, #800 WASHINGTON, DC 20036 Tracking No: 5000232685 PUBLIC COMPANY ACCOUNTING OVERSIGHT BOARD 1666 K Street NW, Ste. 800 WASHINGTON, DC 20036 Tracking No: 5000232686
                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Event Scheduled Event: Initial Scheduling Conference-60 Date: 06/11/2021 Time: 9:30 am Judge: PARK, JASON Location: Courtroom 519
                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None
                        eComplaint Filed. Submitted 03/05/2021 20:49. ts. (DEFENDANT DUHNKE NAME ON THE SUMMONS DO NOT MATCH COMPLAINT) Attorney: MOON, DAVID M. E. (1047947) SUE LEE (Plaintiff);
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None
                          Complaint for Employment Discrimination (Non-MPA) Filed Receipt: 468861 Date: 03/08/2021

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 198 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?