SEC v. SAYLOR, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02995-TPJ
District Judge Thomas Penfield Jackson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 8, 2021 at 5:01 PM DT (1.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phil Gross +1 202 942 4633
v.
No Logo MARK STEVEN LYNCH, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL JERRY SAYLOR, Defendant
No Logo SASNJEEV KUMAR BANSAL, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/14/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 77 Securities Fraud
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County 11001
Terminated 12/18/2000
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,TYPE-E
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
JUDGMENT of permanent injunction by Judge Thomas P. Jackson in favor of plaintiff SEC against defendant MICHAEL JERRY SAYLOR, defendant SASNJEEV KUMAR BANSAL, defendant MARK STEVEN LYNCH (N) (rew) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/11/2018) (bj).
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 Miscellaneous Document
    CONSENT and undertaking by defendant SASNJEEV KUMAR BANSAL (rew)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 Miscellaneous Document
      CONSENT and undertaking by defendant MARK STEVEN LYNCH (rew)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 Miscellaneous Document
        CONSENT and undertaking by defendant MICHAEL JERRY SAYLOR (rew)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 Complaint
          COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff SEC (bjsp) (bj).
            LREF
            Blank  Waiver of Service
            SUMMONS NOT ISSUED. (bjsp)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 96 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?