Delorenzo v. Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00324-MGC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alketa Delorenzo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trisha Kaewcharoen +1 212 693 3355 +1 212 430 6797
v.
No Logo Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo District Director of the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration services for New York Office, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 1/14/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Pretrial Conference - Initial
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/24/2008. By one week from today, counsel for the deft is directed to submit a status letter to the Court. (djc)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Answer
    ANSWER to Complaint Complaint in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director of the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration services for New York Office.(Oeltjen, Natasha)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER, that defendants time to answer the complaint be extended for 60 days, until 6/3/08. Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security answer due 6/3/2008. (Signed by Judge Miriam Goldman Cedarbaum on 4/8/08) (cd)
        LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen on behalf of Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director of the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration services for New York Office (Oeltjen, Natasha)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk
          Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: [2] Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (ae)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk
            Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: [2] Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (ae)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Note Regarding Deleted Document
              ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [3] Duplicate Entry. SEE [2] ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (db)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Cashiers Remark
                CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [2] Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 01/14/2008, Receipt Number 638174. (jd)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                  ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. Attorney Trisha Kaewcharoen, admitted Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Alketa Delorenzo in this action. (Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Part I on 1/14/08) (ae)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
                    Complaint IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director of the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration services for New York Office (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 638173).Document filed by Alketa Delorenzo.(rdz)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                      Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Case Designation
                        Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (rdz)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 74 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?