Simon Classen v. Tesla Motors, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 21STCV20167

Tags
Last Updated June 14, 2021 at 10:08 AM DT (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Classen Simon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kechichian Gregory K..
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors Inc."
Type Contract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (no fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: 6/9/2021 Summons
on Complaint
    Blank 5 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: 6/7/2021 Attachment
    Song-Beverly Act Joint CMC Statement Addendum
      Blank 4 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: 6/7/2021 Notice of Case Management Conference
        Blank 3 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet
          Blank 2 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/28/2021, Entered: 5/28/2021 Complaint

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 9 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?