Michael Augusto Slater v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 21VECV00108

Tags
Last Updated June 14, 2021 at 12:33 PM DT (3.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Slater Michael Augusto, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Type Other Contract Dispute (not breach/insurance/fraud/negligence) (General Jurisdiction)
Status Request for Dismissal - Before Trial not following ADR or more than 60 days since ADR 02/03/2021
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/2021, Entered: 3/17/2021 Notice Ofentry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service
    Blank 6 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021 Request For Dismissal
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 Summons
      on Complaint
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet
          Blank 3 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: 1/27/2021 Notice of Case Management Conference
            Blank 2 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021 Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021 Complaint

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?