USA v. Miller, et al
Criminal Case Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:21-cr-00142-DSD-KMM

Tags
Last Updated June 18, 2021 at 6:27 PM DT (3.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miranda E. Dugi +1 216 622 3844 +1 216 522 2404 miranda.dugi@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph H Thompson +1 312 469 6131 joseph.thompson2@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Mark Allen Miller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Beito & Lengeling, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A Lengeling +1 612 767 1618 +1 612 341 9079 rob@beitolengelinglaw.com
Mark Allen Miller (1)
Office DMN
Filed 6/16/2021
County Hennepin
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371, 1578j(b) and 78ff and 17 C.F.R. Section 240.10b-5 CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 11-15
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 WIRE FRAUD
Count 2-10
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
1578j(b) and 78ff; and 17 C.F.R. Section 240.10b-5, and 182 AIDING AND ABETTING SECURITIES FRAUD
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: 6/18/2021 Summons issuedCourt Filing
Summons Issued in case as to Saeid Jaberian. Initial Appearance set for 7/2/2021 at 01:15 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (MKB)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: 6/18/2021 Summons issuedCourt Filing
    DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. Summons Issued in case as to Saeid Jaberian. Initial Appearance set for 7/2/2021 at 01:15 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (MKB) Modified text on 6/18/2021 (MKB).
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: 6/18/2021 Summons issuedCourt Filing
      Summons Issued in case as to Mark Allen Miller. Initial Appearance set for 7/2/2021 at 01:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (MKB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: 6/18/2021 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for USA. (Dugi, Miranda)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: 6/18/2021 Order on Motion to Unseal CaseCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [8] Motion to Unseal Case as to Mark Allen Miller (1), Christopher James Rajkaran (2), Saeid Jaberian (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/18/2021. (MME) Modified text on 6/18/2021 (LEG).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: 6/18/2021, Terminated: 6/18/2021 Motion to Unseal Case
            MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Mark Allen Miller, Christopher James Rajkaran, Saeid Jaberian. (MME)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 order on motion to seal documentCourt Filing
              Oral Order granting Motion to Seal pursuant to Rule 49.1(d) of the Local Rules for the District of Minnesota, the indictments proposed to be filed under seal be so filed and remain sealed until the defendant make his/her initial appearance before the court as to Mark Allen Miller (1), Christopher James Rajkaran (2), Saeid Jaberian (3) by Judge David S. Doty on 6/16/21. (MKB)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 motion to seal document
                Oral Motion to Seal pursuant to LR 49.1 the Indictment be sealed and remain sealed until the defendants have had their first appearance by USA as to Mark Allen Miller, Christopher James Rajkaran, Saeid Jaberian. (MKB)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 Defendant Information Sheet and/or Signature Page
                  Defendant Information Sheet as to Mark Allen Miller, Christopher James Rajkaran, Saeid Jaberian. (Attachments: # (1) Original Signature Page) (MKB) DOCUMENTS QC'd by KT on 6/18/21. (kt)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 Defendant Information Sheet and/or Signature Page
                    DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. Defendant Information Sheet as to Mark Allen Miller, Christopher James Rajkaran, Saeid Jaberian. (MKB) Modified text on 6/17/2021 (MKB).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: 6/17/2021 indictmentCourt Filing
                      INDICTMENT (Unsealed 6/18/2021) assigned to Judge David S. Doty referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez by USA Joseph H Thompson as to Mark Allen Miller (1) counts 1, 2-10, 11-15, Christopher James Rajkaran (2) counts 1, 3-10, 11-15, Saeid Jaberian (3) counts 1, 7-10, 11-15. Forfeiture allegations as to this indictment. (MKB) Modified text on 6/18/2021 (MME). DOCUMENTS QC'd by KT on 6/18/21. (kt)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 167 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?