Smith v. Tesla Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG21099769

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:32 PM DT (1.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Smith, Knoll, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Feely, John C., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2021, Entered: None ?
Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None ?
    Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: None ?
      Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None ?
        Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: None ?
          Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None ?
            Initial Case Management Conference 10/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 15 (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None ?Court Filing
              Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None ?
                Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Knoll Smith (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (7 Pages)

                      Space Space

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 33 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?