Shenkman v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG21102833

Tags
Last Updated July 6, 2021 at 4:14 PM DT (3.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shenkman, Kevin, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Korovilas, Dimitrios V., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None ?
Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 23 (2 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 6 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None ?
    Complex Determination Hearing 08/03/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None ?
      Declaration in support of venue Filed (3 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None ?
        Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None ?
          Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kevin Shenkman (3 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None ?
            Complex Designation Requested
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None ?
              Complaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed (82 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 197 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?