Babak Mehranvar v. Tesla Motors, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Orange, Case No. 30-2021-01207656-CU-BC-CJC

Tags
Last Updated June 29, 2021 at 6:34 PM DT (3.5 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BABAK MEHRANVAR, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo TESLA FINANCE LLC, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "TESLA MOTORS, INC"
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: 6/29/2021
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2022 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
    Blank 6 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021
    CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 06/28/2021.
      Blank 5 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: 6/29/2021
      PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12905720 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12733542.
        Blank 4 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021
        SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEHRANVAR, BABAK ON 06/28/2021
          Blank 3 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021
          CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEHRANVAR, BABAK ON 06/28/2021
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: 6/28/2021
            COMPLAINT FILED BY MEHRANVAR, BABAK ON 06/28/2021
              Blank 1 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: 6/29/2021
              E-FILING TRANSACTION 41210347 RECEIVED ON 06/28/2021 11:58:51 AM.

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 160 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?