Santos v. Quarantillo et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01296-NRB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jose Alphonso Santos, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Earl Ian Laidlow +1 212 233 4600 +1 212 233 4604 elaidlow@optonline.net
v.
No Logo Andrea Quarantillo, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kirti Vaidya Reddy +1 212 637 2751 +1 212 637 2786 kirti.reddy@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 2/8/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 8 U.S.C. § 1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County NewYork
Terminated 4/11/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is stipulated and agreed by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties to the above captioned action that the action, shall be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or attorney's fees to either party. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/10/08) (js)
    LREF
    Blank 3 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE re: documents served by hand upon U.S. Attorney Michael J. Garcia served on 2/8/2008. Document filed by Jose Alphonso Santos. (pl)
      LREF
      Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of Andrea Quarantillo, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (Reddy, Kirti)
        LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Petition - other
        PETITION FOR REVIEW OF THE DENIAL OF AN APPLICATION FOR NATURALIZATION. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 6400830).Document filed by Jose Alphonso Santos.(jpo)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Case Designated ECF.
          Case Designated ECF. (jpo)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Case Designation
            Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (jpo)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
              SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrea Quarantillo, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jpo)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 85 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?