Pinkard v. Gonzalez et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01122-KMW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Byron Pinkard, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alberto Gonzalez, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleeza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Defendant
Officially listed as "George W. Bush"
No Logo Lauren Sacks, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Motor Vehicle, Defendant
No Logo Nina Heading, Defendant
No Logo Richard Chaney, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Others, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 2/4/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Federal Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County NewYork
Terminated 2/4/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PRO-SE
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
MEMORANDUM TO DOCKET: that a copy of document#3,4 was not re-mailed to plaintiff/petitioner because no new address provided to the Court. (pl)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Received Returned Mail
    Received returned mail re: [3] Order Dismissing Complaint (I.F.P.). Mail was addressed to Mr. Byron D. Pinkard at 315 Bowery, New York, NY 10003 and was returned for the following reason(s): return to sender - no reason given. (tve)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint)Court Filing
      JUDGMENT. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed: That the complaint be and is hereby dismissed. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). We certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's order will not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 2/4/2008) (mbe)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Complaint)Court Filing
        JUDGMENT. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed: That the complaint be and is hereby dismissed. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). We certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's order will not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 2/4/2008) (mbe)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Order Dismissing Complaint (I.F.P.)Court Filing
          ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court grants his application to proceed in forma pauperis, but dismisses the complaint for the reasons set forth below. This court twice warned plaintiff in September 2007 that the further filing frivolous, duplicative or non-meritorious cases may result in the issuance of an order barring the acceptance of any future complaints for filing without obtaining Accordingly, the complaint, filed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). We certify pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 2/4/2008) (mbe)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Complaint
            COMPLAINT against Unknown Others, Alberto Gonzalez, George W. Bush, Richard Chaney, Condoleeza Rice, Michael Bloomberg, Lauren Sacks, Nina Heading, Motor Vehicle. Document filed by Byron Pinkard.(mbe)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Declaration in Support of I.F.P.
              DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Byron Pinkard.(mbe)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Case Designation
                Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (mbe)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 22 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?