Wilson, et al v. American Airlines, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-06968-AKH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Victor M. Turcios, Plaintiff
v.
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Boeing Company"
No Logo Burns International Security Services Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
No Logo Emery Roth & Sons, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Emery Roth and Partners, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Globe Aviation Services Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Jones Hirsch Connors & Bull PC

No Logo Huntleigh USA Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo ICTS International NV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Paul Robbins +1 212 448 1100 +1 212 448 0066 probbins@mclaughlinstern.com
No Logo In Vision Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo L-3 Security & Detection Systems, Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates, Defendant
No Logo Magnusson Klemenic Associates, Defendant
No Logo Massachusetts Port Authority, Defendant
No Logo Minoru Yamasaki Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinkerton's, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Quantam Magnetics, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securitas Ab, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skilling Ward Magnusson Barkshire, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The Boening Company, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Realty & Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo US Airways Shuttle, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant
No Logo USAir Group, Defendant
No Logo The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael D. Steger, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Douglas Steger +1 845 727 1750 +1 845 689 2155 msteger@steger-law.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/10/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Bronx
Terminated 2/13/2008
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Related Case
121-mc-00097-AKH-THK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER, RELATED
  Entries (135) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 121 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT. Counsel for plaintiff is required to show, by 9/19/08, if any claims remain outstanding against nonsettling defendants, and justify to the Court's satisfaction why the Court should approve a second Order of Final Judgment and as further set forth in said Order. This Document relates to 21mc101 and 03-6968. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/3/08) (rjm)
    LREF
    Legal Document 119 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
    FINAL JUDGMENT that there is no just reason for delay pursuant to FRCP 54(b), settling the action as to 03 CV 6968(AKH) and dismissing the complaint with prejudice as to all defendants. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/11/08) (Attachments: # (1) notice of right to appeal)(ml)
      LREF
      Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [116] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
        LREF
        Legal Document 117 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Declaration in Support of Motion
        DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: [116] MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
          LREF
          Legal Document 116 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008, Terminated: 2/13/2008 ~Motion for Judgment
          MOTION for Judgment Approving Settlement and Dismissing Complaint. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation.(Barry, Desmond)
            LREF
            Legal Document 115 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 2/13/2008 Motion for Leave to File Document
            MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside the Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality. Document filed by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Attachments: # (1) Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Aside Defendants' Designations of Confidentiality)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Steger, Michael)
              LREF
              Legal Document 114 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                LREF
                Legal Document 113 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims By The Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiff's Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. i/s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Order on Motion to Substitute PartyCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [110] Motion to Substitute Party. Victor M. Turcios added. Ann Wilson terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/3/2007) (jar)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 12/4/2007 Motion to Substitute Party
                      MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Ann Wilson, New Party: Victor M. Turcios Line attaching proposed Order. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Azrael, Jonathan)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 109 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [87] FIRST MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Ann Wilson, New Party: Victor M. Turcios filed by Ann Wilson. Endorsement: Counsel shall submit an order consented by the client and other counsel. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/15/2007) (jar)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Note Regarding Deleted Document
                          ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [110] Memo-Endorsement on motion by plaintiff and counsel requesting that the court substitute Victor M. Turciso as the named plaintiff in this action. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (pl)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 108 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Adoption of Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by The Boening Company. (Attachments: # (1) Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint)(Lent, Eric)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 107 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER OF HUNTLEIGH USA, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED FLIGHT 11 COMPLAINT served on All Parties on November 13, 2007. Service was accepted by Pursuant to Court Order. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (Ross, Johnathan)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 106 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Answer
                                ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit MASTER ANSWER OF HUNTLEIGH USA, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED FLIGHT 11 COMPLAINT)(Ross, Johnathan)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 105 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                  NOTICE of Notice of Adoption to Flight 11 Fourth Amended MLC. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. (Crowley, Michael)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 104 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Answer
                                    ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services Corporation.(Connors, James)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 103 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of Adoption of Master Answer to Plaintiffs' Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by US Airways, Inc.. (Guilfoyle, Kathleen)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 102 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE of adoption of answer to amended complaint. Document filed by ICTS International NV. (Attachments: # (1))(Robbins, Jon)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                          NOTICE of Adoption. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Flight 11 Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint (21-MC-00097))(Barry, Desmond)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 100 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE of of Adoption. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Wood, Willard)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 99 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE of of Adoption. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Service)(Moryan, Jeffrey)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 98 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER that the captioned actions be removed from the damages-only trial calendar. The parties shall proceed to conclude the settlements promptly in accordance with the procedures heretofore established in this litigation and as required by the applicability to these actions of the Air Transportation Safety and System Stabilization Act, Pub. L. No. 107-42 115 Stat. 230 (2001)... and as further set forth in said order. This Document relates to 02-7150, 03-6966, 03-6968. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/1/07) (rjm)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 97 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                  DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: [96] Memorandum of Law in Support. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 96 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support
                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Court Approval of Wilson Settlement and in Opposition to Design/Construction Defendants' Objections to Settlement. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Barry, Desmond)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 95 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER FOR HEARING TO CONSIDER SETTLEMENT. Settlement Conference set for 10/19/2007 at 02:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of hearing to consider settlement. This Document relates to 21MC97 and 03-6968. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/9/07) (rjm)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 94 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 93 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 92 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Peter J. Gallagher dated 9/17/07 re: We write on behalf of client Leslie E. Robertson & Associates, P.C. to address a situation that we believe requires clarification, and with respect to which we seek Your Honor's intervention. ENDORSEMENT: "Liaison Counsel for plaintiffs and for defendants shall state the course of action they recommend for the Court to follow, using the format provided by my Individual Rule 2E, said letter to be telefaxed to the Court by noon, September 26, 2007." This Document relates to 21MC97 and 03cv6968. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/19/07) (rjm)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 91 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER REGARDING DAMAGES TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL PROCEEDINGS. This Document relates to 21MC97, 02-7912 (Driscoll), 03-6966 (Houtz), 02-7153 (Carstanjen), 03-6968 (Wiswe), 02-7150 (Ambrose), 02-456 (Marcin). That Driscoll case be Ready for Trial by 9/24/2007, Ambrose case be made ready for trial of damages only to begin on 10/15/07; that Plaintiffs identify all fact and expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 8/6/07; Plaintiffs provide a curriculum vitae for all identified expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 8/6/07; and Plaintiffs provide reports for all identified expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 8/10/07; further ordered that Defendants identify all fact and expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 8/24/07; Defts. provide a curriculum vitae for all identified expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 8/24/07; and Defts. provide reports for all identified expert witnesses for the Driscoll case by 9/10/07; and it is further ordered that Ptffs. identify all fact and expert witnesses for the Ambrose case by 8/17/07; Ptffs. provide a curriculum vitae for all identified expert witnesses for the Ambrose case by 8/17/07; and Ptffs. provide reports for all identified expert witnesses for the Ambrose case by 8/24/07; and it is further ordered that Defts. identify all fact and expert witnesses for the Ambrose case by 9/7/07; Defts. provide a reports for all identified expert witnesses for the Ambrose case by 9/24/07. That the parties submit proposed jury instructions for the Driscoll case by 9/17/07. Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2007 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this order regarding damages trial and pre-trial proceedings. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/3/07) (rjm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 90 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: plaintiff Ann Wilson, as Administrator of the Estate of Sigrid C. Wiswe, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Sigrid C. Wiswe voluntarily dismisses this action as against dft World Trade Center Properties LLC only, with prejudice and the same hereby is dismissed with prejudice, without cost to either party as against the other. Plaintiff's claims against all other dfts are not dismissed and are unaffected by this dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) World Trade Center Properties LLC terminated.(dle) Modified on 8/28/2007 (Lewis, Diahan). (Entered: 07/24/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2007 (Lewis, Diahan).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 89 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, and 4 World Trade Center LLC, contained in the Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 88 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, and 7 World Trade Company, L.P. contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 4/4/2008 Terminate Motions
                                                                      Motions terminated: (1058 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK, 61 in 1:05-cv-07243-AKH) CROSS MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims for Punitive Damages. filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., 5 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C.. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 87 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007, Terminated: 11/15/2007 Motion to Substitute Party
                                                                        FIRST MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Ann Wilson, New Party: Victor M. Turcios. Document filed by Ann Wilson.Return Date set for 7/18/2007 at 11:05 AM. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter of Administration De Bonis Non)(Azrael, Jonathan)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 86 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey (PANYNJ), contained in the Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant AirTran, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 85 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                            AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 84 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              PRIVACY ACT ORDER. To the extent that the Government objects to providing the parties with the requested information on the ground that such production is prohibited by the Privacy Act, the objection is overruled and the US shall produce the Requested Information to the parties purs. to 5 U.S.C. 552a(b)(11). This Document relates to 21MC101. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 83 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government. Memorandum of the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey in Support of Focused Discovery from the Government. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Jacob, Beth)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 82 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1003 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (1034 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery for a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1016 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 81 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                    DECLARATION of Robert A. Clifford, Gregory P. Joseph, Marc S. Moller, Ronald L. Motley, Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (1003 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1026 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of All Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (1034 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery for a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (1016 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 80 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 79 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (1040 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Discovery The Aviation Defendants' Notice of Motion for Focused Discovery from the Government.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, LLC, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation, World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 78 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:03-cv-07076-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 77 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Wolfgang A. Dase, Esq. in Support re: (58 in 1:03-cv-07076-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 76 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 2/13/2008 ~Motion to Sever
                                                                                              CROSS MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims for Punitive Damages. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Cohen, Jason)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 75 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without prejudice (This document relates to All Cases); the Cross-Claims by Cross-claim pltffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trace Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trace Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability complaint and Cross-claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against deft AirTran, are dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/11/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(sn)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 74 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NON-WAIVER AGREEMENT... It is hereby agreed, by and between the undersigned counsel that any disclosure of a document or information by the Government shall not constitute a waiver by the Government of any privilege or other protection that may be applicable or information not disclosed. This Non-Waiver Agreement does not constitute and agreement by the Government to produce any particular document or information in the litigation, and is without prejudice to any objections the Government may have to any party's discovery requests. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/1/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al. This Document also relates to 21MC101.(rjm)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 73 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that deft. AirTran Airways, Inc. is dismissed w/out prejudice and w/out costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97) and in any other actions involving United Airlines Flight 175 departing from Logan Airport in Boston... 03-6802, 02-6364, 02-7154, 03-6811, 03-6801, 02-7153, 02-2802, 02-0458, 03-7083, 02-7152, 03-7084, 02-1727, 02-6365. Ptffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the 1/26/06 or 6/19/06 affidavits of Warren Turner submitted on behalf of AirTran Airways, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/30/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 72 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                      COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 71 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Keith Harris in Opposition re: (969 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc. and Joining U.S.Airways, Inc's, U.S. Airways Group, Inc's and Colgan Air, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment on the World Trade Center Properties' Cross Claims on United F. Document filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 70 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Richard A Williamson in Opposition re: (969 in 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Continental Airlines, Inc. and Joining U.S.Airways, Inc's, U.S. Airways Group, Inc's and Colgan Air, Inc's Motion for Summary Judgment on the World Trade Center Properties' Cross Claims on United F. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(Scholz, Andrew)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice... that defendant MIDWEST AIRLINES, formally known as MIDWEST EXPRESS AIRLINES, is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without cost to either party as against the other in the following individual action consolidated in the: In Re: September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 1. Feller v AMR Corporation, etal: 04 CV 09627... and as further set forth in said Stipulation of Dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/28/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                              STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that Defts. UAL Corporation and United Airlines, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11th Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-8918, 04-7291, 03-7076, 02-8916, 02-7156, 02-7155, 03-6803, 03-7040, 02-3676, 03-7022, 03-7070, 02-7289, 03-7071, 02-7144... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/23/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 67 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that defendant AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., named herein as two separate defendants, AMERICA WEST and AMERICA WEST AIRLINES, INC., is hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other in the following individual actions consolidated in the In Re September 11 Litigation (21 MC 97): 02-7290, 02-7289, 02-7144, 02-7155, 02-3676, 02-7156, 02-8918, 02-8916, 03-6803, 03-7076, 03-7040, 03-7022, 03-7071, 03-7050, 04-7291 and 04-9627. Plaintiffs specifically reserve the right to recommence these actions if the statements in the affidavits of Rodney Frascht submitted on behalf of America West Airlines, Inc. are proven untrue. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK et al.(rjm)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 66 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER... All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case who are not yet registered to file documents electronically, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by November 1, 2006. Forms can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. As of October 17, 2006 all documents filed in the Miscellaneous case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the Court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov. All correspondences are to be submitted in either Word or WordPerfect format to WTC_letters@nysd.uscourts.gov. The subject heading of the email must include the case number of the action or actions that the email pertains to. No correspondences are to be sent to Chambers through regular mail. No correspondences should be in the form of a motion. Amended complaints and supplemental pleading shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action to which they are being added... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK,1:02-cv-00456-AKH,1:02-cv-00458-AKH,1:02-cv-01727-AKH,1:02-cv-01728-AKH,1:02-cv-03676-AKH,1:02-cv-06186-AKH,1:02-cv-06364-AKH,1:02-cv-06365-AKH,1:02-cv-06378-AKH,1:02-cv-06379-AKH,1:02-cv-07144-AKH,1:02-cv-07145-AKH,1:02-cv-07147-AKH,1:02-cv-07149-AKH,1:02-cv-07150-AKH,1:02-cv-07153-AKH,1:02-cv-07154-AKH,1:02-cv-07155-AKH,1:02-cv-07156-AKH,1:02-cv-07259-AKH,1:02-cv-07260-AKH,1:02-cv-07261-AKH,1:02-cv-07289-AKH,1:02-cv-07290-AKH,1:02-cv-07608-AKH,1:02-cv-07912-AKH,1:02-cv-08916-AKH,1:02-cv-08918-AKH,1:02-cv-08919-AKH,1:02-cv-09234-AKH,1:02-cv-10273-AKH,1:03-cv-00006-AKH,1:03-cv-00029-AKH,1:03-cv-00332-AKH-THK,1:03-cv-01016-AKH,1:03-cv-06183-AKH,1:03-cv-06801-AKH,1:03-cv-06805-AKH,1:03-cv-06843-AKH,1:03-cv-06929-AKH,1:03-cv-06940-AKH,1:03-cv-07019-AKH,1:03-cv-07040-AKH,1:03-cv-07641-AKH,1:03-cv-10203-AKH,1:04-cv-00365-AKH,1:04-cv-01857-AKH,1:04-cv-07189-AKH,1:04-cv-07226-AKH,1:04-cv-07298-AKH,1:04-cv-08067-AKH,1:04-cv-09627-AKH,1:05-cv-07243-AKH,1:06-cv-02990-AKH,1:06-cv-05115-AKH,1:06-cv-05967-AKH,2:03-cv-06105-AKH,2:03-cv-06310-AKH,2:03-cv-06800-AKH,2:03-cv-06802-AKH,2:03-cv-06803-AKH,2:03-cv-06808-AKH,2:03-cv-06810-AKH,2:03-cv-06811-AKH,2:03-cv-06838-AKH,2:03-cv-06966-AKH,2:03-cv-06968-AKH,2:03-cv-07021-AKH,2:03-cv-07022-AKH,2:03-cv-07071-AKH,2:03-cv-07076-AKH,2:03-cv-07083-AKH,2:03-cv-07084-AKH(mj, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                    Case Designated ECF. (rjm, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of NOTICE of Adopting Master answer of cross-claim defendants Colgan Air, Inc. to the WTCP entities' amended cross-claims against certain defendants in plaintiffs' amended flight 11 Master Liability complaint. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (jco, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                        NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER OF CROSS-CLAIM DEFENDANTS AMR CORPORATION AND AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. TO THE WTCP ENTITIES' AMENDED CROSS-CLAIMS AGAINST CERTAIN DEFENDANTS IN PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation.(sac, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                          ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIM by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants in Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint as its Answer to the WTCP Entities' cross-claims. Document filed by Boeing Company.(sac, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                            ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIM by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants in Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint as its Answer to the WTCP Entities' cross-claims. Document filed by ICTS International NV.(sac, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                              ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIM by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants in Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint as its Answer to the WTCP Entities' cross-claims. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority.(sac, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HUNTLEIGH USA CORPORATION TO THE WTCP ENTITIES' CROSS-CLAIMS. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (jco, ) Modified on 12/2/2005 (jco, ).
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT, the claims asserted in this action against individual Defendant Delta Connection, Inc., ONLY, be dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. The action remains pending as it is not dismissed as to any other Defendant. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/15/04) (dt, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL against deft. American Eagle only, with prejudice and without costs.... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/14/04) (jf, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of of adoption of cross-claims by the WTCP entities against certain defendants in plaintiffs' amended flight 11 master liability complaint. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER the complaint in this action, is hereby deemed amended to substitute World Trade Center Properties LLC for Silverstein Properties, Inc. and to delete Silverstein Properties, Inc. as a party from the action. Service of the summons and complaint in this action upon Silverstein Properties, Inc. is hereby deemed effective upon World Trade Center Properties LLC. The caption for all future papers and submissions in this action shall list World Trade Center Properties LLC in the place and stead of Silverstein Properties, Inc. The undersigned counsel may sign this stipulation and order by electronic transmission and such signatures will be as valid as an originalsignature. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/7/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 7/19/2004 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER for substitution of co-counsel for defendant The Boeing Company. Original filed in case 21MC91, Doc# 561 (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/24/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION # 90212 PARTIALLY GRANTING & PARTIALLY DENYING Defts' Motions re: [463] MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, [460] MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., [467] MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc. This Document relates to 02-7272, 03-7019, 04-1857, 02-7143, 02-7244, 04-2519, denied. 02-7267, 03-6183, 03-6966, 03-6968, 03-7028, 03-7070, granted. The Original of this Document is entered as Document No. 549 under Case No. 21-mc-97. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/10/04) (rjm, ) Modified on 6/14/2004 (rjm,). (Entered: 06/10/2004). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/10/04) (rjm, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ADOPTION TO ITS MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services Corporation. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of adopting Massachusetts Port Authority's Master Answer to plaintiffs' amended flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (jp, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Adopting Answer of Defendants AMR Corporation and American Airlines, Inc. To Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc. (dfe, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Adoption Of Master Answer Of Defendant Huntleigh USA Corporation. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (jmi, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by The Boening Company. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED. Document filed by Minoru Yamasaki Associates, Inc.. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc.. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ADOPTION; defendant hereby adopts its Master Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Leslie E. Robertson Associates. Received in the night deposit box on 5/14/04 at 6:01 P.M. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL with prejudice as against deft. Frontier Airlines only and without costs to either party.... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/12/04) (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC.(sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ITS MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 11 LIABILITY COMPLAINT/CROSSCLAIMS. Document filed by Tishman Realty & Construction Company. Jury demand. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Tishman Realty & Construction Company.(sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER of defendant ICTS International, N.V. Document filed by ICTS International NV.(db, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P., plaintiffs dismiss, with prejudice, all claims asserted in this action against these individual defendants only: L-3 Communications Corporations Security and Detection Systems; L-3 Communications Corporations; L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc.; Invision Technologies, Inc.; Quatum Magnetics, Inc.; Heimann Systems Corp. a subsidiary of Smiths Heiman GMBH; Heimann Systems GMBH and Heimann Systems GMBH, a division of Smiths Group. The action remains pending as it is not dismissed as to any other defendants (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/5/04) (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P.; plaintiffs dismiss, with prejudice, all claims asseted in this action against these individual defendants ONLY: Alaska Airlines, Inc; Alaska Air Group; America West and City of Portland, Maine. The action remains pending as it is not dismissed as to any other defendant. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/5/04) (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by John L. Altieri Jr. on behalf of Massachusetts Port Authority. New Address: O'Melveny & Myers, L.L.P., Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square, New York, NY, 10036, (212) 326-2000. Original document filed in case #21MC97, document #408.(dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Richard A. Williamson dated 3/24/2004; counsel for the Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and World Trade Center Properties LLC write to propose the following schedule: plaintiffs are to provide the documents requested by 4/23/2004. By 5/24/2004, defendants will decide whether defendants need to take any depositions before they are able to move to dismiss. If defendants need any depositions, defendants will first contact the plaintiffs' counsel whose case it is and ask whether plaintiffs consent. Defendants will then ask for a conference with Your Honor to determine whether defendants may take such deposition(s) before moving. If depositions are conducted, defendants will move to dismiss within 30 days of the last deposition. Opposing papers will be served within two weeks after the motion(s) to dismiss are served, and reply papers will be served within one week after the opposition papers are served. If defendants do not need any depositions, defendants will serve motion(s) to dismiss by 5/24/2004. Opposing papers will be served by 6/7/2004, and reply papers will be served by 6/14/2004. Counsel also request that plaintiff Madeleine Zuccala's action (the Fiedelberg action) be added to the cases listed in the 3/18/2004 Order which are subject to motions to dismiss at this time. So Ordered. This document relates to 03cv7018, 03cv6966, 03cv7051, 03cv7022, 03cv7019, 02cv7152, 02cv6362, 02cv7244, 03cv7134, 02cv7231, 03cv6968. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/24/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #328.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Cashiers Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                    CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on [36] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $75.00, paid on 3/23/04, Receipt Number 502888. (yv, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Securitas AB served on 3/17/2004, answer due 4/6/2004. Service was accepted by Nina Svensson. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the F.R.C.P. as pertains to the claims of pltff Beth A. Faragher. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/2004) (jp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER; the parties appeared before me on 3/17/2004 to show cause why plaintiffs, who had claims pending in the Victim Compensation Fund (VCF), as listed on Appendix A attached to my Order of 3/1/2004, should be granted more time to dismiss their cases... I hereby Order the following: A. Cases or plaintiffs listed immediately below shall be dismissed for the reasons as set forth in this Order: 02cv7031, 02cv7032, 02cv6363, 02cv7185, 02cv10054, 03cv194, 03cv195, 03cv5139, 03cv7043 as to plaintiffs Katja Tatjana Bothe and Costanze Menzel, 03cv7051 as to plaintiffs Steven Feidelberg, Kathleen Lozier, Meredith Anne Fry, Meg Glasser, Jay Michelstein, Helene Passaro, Midori Takahashi, Gregory Stevens, 03cv7064, 03cv6968 as to plaintiff Beth Ann Faragher, 03cv7022 as to plaintiffs Carol Waldie, Elizabeth Kovalcin, Michelle Lancaster. B. The following cases or plaintiffs were incorrectly identified on Appendix A to my 3/1/2004 Order as having claims before the VCF; these cases may proceed in their normal course as active cases: 02cv1727, 02cv7145, 03cv6863. C. Plaintiffs listed immediately below had filed claims with the VCF but withdrew such claims in favor of litigation. These cases shall remain active subject to defendants' motions to dismiss. Defendants' counsel will propose a briefing schedule for motions to dismiss based on waiver by 3/24/2004, as as further set forth in this Order: 02cv6362, 02cv7231, 03cv6966, 03cv6968, 03cv7018, 03cv7019, 03cv7022. D. The following 3 cases concern individuals on whose behalf another family member has filed a claim with the VCF. These cases shall remain active subject to defendants' motions to dismiss. The briefing schedule defendants' counsel submit on 3/24/2004 shall also apply to any motions based on waiver that defendants file concerning these cases: 02cv7152, 02cv7244, 03cv7134. E. Plaintiffs in the following cases are German insurance companies who allege subrogation claims for insureds who died in the September 11th attacks. Personal representatives for such insureds have filed claims in the VCF, raising an issue of whether the right to file suit has been waived. Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit contentions and supporting documentation to defendants liaison counsel by 4/2/2004 as to their rights to sue. Defendants who then wish to bring a motion to dismiss shall describe any discovery they believe to be necessary, and a briefing schedule: 03cv7043, 04cv1382, 04cv1912. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #316.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Order of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER; the parties appeared before me on 3/17/2004 to show cause why plaintiffs, who had claims pending in the Victim Compensation Fund (VCF), as listed on Appendix A attached to my Order of 3/1/2004, should be granted more time to dismiss their cases... I hereby Order the following: A. Cases or plaintiffs listed immediately below shall be dismissed for the reasons as set forth in this Order: 02cv7031, 02cv7032, 02cv6363, 02cv7185, 02cv10054, 03cv194, 03cv195, 03cv5139, 03cv7043 as to plaintiffs Katja Tatjana Bothe and Costanze Menzel, 03cv7051 as to plaintiffs Steven Feidelberg, Kathleen Lozier, Meredith Anne Fry, Meg Glasser, Jay Michelstein, Helene Passaro, Midori Takahashi, Gregory Stevens, 03cv7064, 03cv6968 as to plaintiff Beth Ann Faragher, 03cv7022 as to plaintiffs Carol Waldie, Elizabeth Kovalcin, Michelle Lancaster. B. The following cases or plaintiffs were incorrectly identified on Appendix A to my 3/1/2004 Order as having claims before the VCF; these cases may proceed in their normal course as active cases: 02cv1727, 02cv7145, 03cv6863. C. Plaintiffs listed immediately below had filed claims with the VCF but withdrew such claims in favor of litigation. These cases shall remain active subject to defendants' motions to dismiss. Defendants' counsel will propose a briefing schedule for motions to dismiss based on waiver by 3/24/2004, as as further set forth in this Order: 02cv6362, 02cv7231, 03cv6966, 03cv6968, 03cv7018, 03cv7019, 03cv7022. D. The following 3 cases concern individuals on whose behalf another family member has filed a claim with the VCF. These cases shall remain active subject to defendants' motions to dismiss. The briefing schedule defendants' counsel submit on 3/24/2004 shall also apply to any motions based on waiver that defendants file concerning these cases: 02cv7152, 02cv7244, 03cv7134. E. Plaintiffs in the following cases are German insurance companies who allege subrogation claims for insureds who died in the September 11th attacks. Personal representatives for such insureds have filed claims in the VCF, raising an issue of whether the right to file suit has been waived. Plaintiffs' counsel shall submit contentions and supporting documentation to defendants liaison counsel by 4/2/2004 as to their rights to sue. Defendants who then wish to bring a motion to dismiss shall describe any discovery they believe to be necessary, and a briefing schedule: 03cv7043, 04cv1382, 04cv1912. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/2004) Original document filed in case no. 21 MC 97, doc. #316.(kkc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [36] Motion for Jonathan A. Azrael, Keith S. Franz and Judson H. Lipowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/3/2004) (jsa, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Jonathan A. Azrael, Keith S. Franz, and Judson H. Lipowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO ACTIVATE LAWSUIT, In accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/26/03 in Case #21mc97, Plaintiff Ann Wilson, as Adminstrator of the Estate of Sigrid C. Wiswe, deceased and on behalf of all survivors of Sigrid C. Wiswe, hereby elects to activate the lawsuit and proceed with the litigation. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (sac, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. US Airways, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk in the Corporate Division of the State of NY. Document filed by Beth A. Faragher ; Ann Wilson. (djc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Tishman Realty & Construction Company served at the The Office of the Secretary of State of State of New York on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, Clerk. Document filed by Beth A. Faragher ; Ann Wilson. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Office of the Secretary of State of State of New York re: Emery Roth and Partners, LLC served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch. Document filed by Beth A. Faragher ; Ann Wilson. (pl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Globe Aviation Services Corporation served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Gregory Borgese. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. AMR Corporation served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Gregory Borgese. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Boeing Company served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by NOrah Radler/Secy State of NY. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Minoru Yamasaki Associates, Inc. served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Robert Szantor. Document filed by Beth A. Faragher ; Ann Wilson. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American Airlines, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler at the Office of the Secretary of the State of New York. Document filed by Beth A. Faragher ; Ann Wilson. (tp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. USAir Group served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Blake Hodge of CT Corporation System, a registered agent. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Skilling Ward Magnusson Barkshire, Inc. served on 1/13/2004, answer due 2/2/2004. Service was accepted by William R. Chistopher. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Delta Air Lines, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American West Airlines, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler. (sb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler of the Office of the Secretary of State of NYS. Document filed by Ann Wilson. (kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Burns International Security Services Corporation served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk in office of Secretary of State. Document filed by Beth A. Faragher ; Ann Wilson. (dle, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Magnusson Klemenic Associates served on 1/13/2004, answer due 2/2/2004. Service was accepted by William R. Christopher. Document filed by Beth A. Faragher ; Ann Wilson. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler, clerk, care of the Secretary of State of the State of New York. Document filed by Beth A. Faragher ; Ann Wilson. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Silverstein Properties, Inc. served on 1/7/2004, answer due 1/27/2004. Service was accepted by Norah Radler. Document filed by Beth A. Faragher ; Ann Wilson. (jco, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [15] Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process. Plntfs' will have until 3/5/04 to serve process.. (Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Part I on 1/20/04) copies sent by chambers.(cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT, on Plntfs' Motion (unfiled) For Enlargement or Extension of Time to Serve Process: Motion for enlargement of time to serve process is granted as amended. (Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight on 1/13/04) (cd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004, Terminated: 1/21/2004 Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to serve process. Document filed by Ann Wilson. Return Date set for 3/9/2004 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (pa, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Beth A. Faragher, Ann Wilson. Quantam Magnetics, Inc. waiver sent on 12/22/2003, answer due 2/20/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Beth A. Faragher, Ann Wilson. Pinkerton's, Inc. waiver sent on 12/16/2003, answer due 2/16/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Beth A. Faragher, Ann Wilson. Invision Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 12/19/2003, answer due 2/17/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Beth A. Faragher, Ann Wilson. ICTS International NV waiver sent on 12/15/2003, answer due 2/13/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Beth A. Faragher, Ann Wilson. Huntleigh USA Corporation waiver sent on 12/17/2003, answer due 2/16/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Beth A. Faragher, Ann Wilson. Frontier Airlines waiver sent on 12/16/2003, answer due 2/16/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Beth A. Faragher, Ann Wilson. Colgan Air, Inc. waiver sent on 12/5/2003, answer due 2/3/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Beth A. Faragher, Ann Wilson. American Eagle Airlines, Inc. waiver sent on 12/23/2003, answer due 2/23/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Beth A. Faragher, Ann Wilson. Leslie E. Robertson Associates waiver sent on 12/18/2003, answer due 2/16/2004. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED as to ) O'Melvin & Meyers, LLP. Document filed by Beth A. Faragher, Ann Wilson. (db, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Kenneth P. Nolan . (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 12/12/2006 Case Consolidation - Member
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Case consolidated with 1:21-mc-97. (rjm, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/22/2003 Case Accepted as Related
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case accepted as related to 1:21mc97. Notice of assignment to follow. (jjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; granting [2-1] motion for an order seeking placement of this case on suspense docket. Purs. to the Order issued 7/22/03 in In re 9/11 Litigation, 21 MC 97 (AKH), and applicable to this case, the pltff's motion to place this action on the suspense docket is granted. This case shall be placed on the suspense docket immediately following filing of proof of service of summons and complaint. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ); (sac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003, Terminated: 9/26/2003 Motion to Place on Suspense Docket
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION by Ann Wilson, Beth A. Faragher for an order seeking placement of this case on suspense docket . No Return Date indicated. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 484461. (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE REFERRED TO Judge Hellerstein as possibly similar to 21MC97 (AKH). (db)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 153 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?