Adam Neumann v. Softbank Group Corp.
Administrative Proceeding Delaware Court of Chancery, Case No. 2020-0329-AGB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 7, 2021 at 11:53 PM EDT (5.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Neumann, Adam Neumann, Adam, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, BowX Acquisition Corp.
No Logo We Holdings LLC, Plaintiff
v.
SoftBank Group Corporation SoftBank Group Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "SoftBank Group Corp."
Officer/Director, Morningstar, Inc.
SoftBank Corporation Officer/Director, SoftBank Corporation
Officer/Director, Zd Inc.
Officer/Director, First Virtual Holding Inc
Officer/Director, Intelligroup, Inc.
Officer/Director, SB First Singapore pte Ltd.
SoftBank Holdings Inc Et Al Officer/Director, SoftBank Holdings Inc Et Al
Officer/Director, Utstarcom, Inc.
SoftBank America Inc. Officer/Director, SoftBank America Inc.
Officer/Director, SPRINT CORP
Officer/Director, Starburst I, Inc.
Officer/Director, Delaware Project 6 L.L.C.
SoftBank Group Capital Ltd Officer/Director, SoftBank Group Capital Ltd
Officer/Director, Delaware Project 4 L.L.C.
E*TRADE Group, Inc. Officer/Director, E*TRADE Group, Inc.
Officer/Director, Starburst II, Inc.
Officer/Director, Starburst III, Inc.
Officer/Director, Combes, Michel
Officer/Director, Wireless Facilities, Inc.
Officer/Director, ACON S2 Acquisition Corp.
SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1) L.P. SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1) L.P., Defendant
Officer/Director, Guardant Health, Inc.
Officer/Director, Urban Compass, Inc.
Officer/Director, SVF Excaliber (Cayman) Ltd
Officer/Director, SVF Endurance (Cayman) Ltd
Officer/Director, Zymergen, Inc.
No Logo New Castle County, Sheriff, Sheriff
No Logo The We Company, Interested Party
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 49 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Official Transcript (Addl Fees Apply)
May 18, 2020 - Telephonic Oral Argument and Rulings of the Court on Plaintiffs Neumann and We Holdings LLC's Motion to Consolidate
    Blank 48 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Letter
    Letter to The Honorable Andre G. Bouchard from E. Wade Houston, Esq. enclosing courtesy copies of (i) Defendant SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1) L.P.’s Motion to Dismiss the Verified Complaint of Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC; (ii) Defendant SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1) L.P.’s Opening Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Verified Complaint of Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC; and (iii) Amended Transmittal Declaration of E. Wade Houston, Esq. Under 10 Del. C. § 3927
      Blank 47 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Declaration
      Amended Transmittal Declaration of E. Wade Houston, Esq. Under 10 Del. C. § 3927 in support of Defendant SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1) L.P.’s Opening Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Adam Neumann’s and We Holdings LLC’s Verified Complaint
      Blank 46 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Order
      Granted ([Proposed] Consolidation Order)
        Blank 45 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
        Letter to Chancellor Bouchard from Sabrina M. Hendershot regarding [Proposed] Consolidation Order
        Blank 44 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Letter
        Letter to Chancellor Bouchard from Nicholas J. Rohrer transmitting courtesy copies of Defendant Softbank Group Corp.’s Brief in Support of Softbank Group Corp.’s Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)
          Blank 43 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
          Defendant SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1) L.P.’s Motion to Dismiss the Verified Complaint of Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC
          Blank 42 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Interrogatories
          Notice of Service of (1) Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories and (2) this Notice of Service
            Blank 41 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Affidavit
            Transmittal Affidavit of E. Wade Houston, Esq. in support of Defendant SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1) L.P.’s Opening Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Adam Neumann’s and We Holdings LLC’s Verified Complaint
            Blank 40 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
            Defendant Softbank Group, Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) with certificate of service
            Blank 39 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Order
            Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Commission for issuance of a Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum upon Trustbridge Partners)
              Blank 38 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Motion for Commission
              Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Commission for issuance of a Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum upon Trustbridge Partners (with Certificate of Service)
              Blank 37 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Order
              Granted (Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss)
                Blank 36 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss
                  Blank 35 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service
                  Notice of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum upon TBP Consulting (US) Ltd. (with Certificate of Service)
                  Blank 34 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Interrogatories
                  Notice of Service of (1) Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, and (2) this Notice of Service
                    Blank 33 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service of Request for Production
                    Notice of Service of (1) Defendants’ First Set of Requests for Production and (2) this Notice of Service
                      Blank 32 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Judicial Action Form
                      Telephonic Oral Argument and Rulings of the Court on Plaintiffs Adam Newmann and We Holdings LLC's Motion to Consolidate held with Ch. Bouchard 5.18.2020. Motion granted in the main. See transcript for Rulings.
                        Blank 31 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Order
                        Granted (The Parties’ Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information)
                          Blank 30 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                          Unsworn Declaration of Service of Verified Complaint Pursuant to 10 Del. C. § 3927 upon Defendant SoftBank Group Corp. (with Certificate of Service)
                          Blank 29 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                          The Parties’ Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information
                          Blank 27 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                          Entry of Appearance of William B. Chandler III on behalf Interested Party The We Company with Certificate of Service
                            Blank 28 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                            Letter to The Honorable Andre G. Bouchard from William B. Chandler III Regarding the Motion to Consolidate
                              Blank 26 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None reply
                              Reply in Further Support of Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC's Motion to Consolidate (with Certificate of Service)
                              Blank 25 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Opposition
                              SoftBank Group Corp.'s Opposition to Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC's Motion to Consolidate
                              Blank 24 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                              Granted ([PROPOSED] Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Confidential Treatment for Defendant’s Opposition to Plaintiffs’ Motion to Consolidate and related papers)
                                Blank 23 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                Letter to The Honorable Andre G. Bouchard from E. Wade Houston, Esq. enclosing copies of (i) Vision Fund’s response to the motion to consolidate and (ii) Vision Fund’s proposed consolidation order
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Motion
                                  Defendant's Motion for Confidential Treatment
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                  Letter to The Honorable Andre G. Bouchard from Sabrina M. Hendershot providing the dial-in information for the telephonic hearing on Plaintiffs Adam Neumann and We Holdings, LLC's Motion to Consolidate scheduled for May 18, 2020 at 1:30 PM
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 5/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                    Letter to Chancellor Bouchard from Elena C. Norman transmitting courtesy copies of Defendant SoftBank Group Corp.’s Opposition to Plaintiffs’ Motion to Consolidate
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                      Entry of Appearance of Michael A. Barlow, Esq. and E. Wade Houston, Esq. of Abrams & Bayliss LLP on behalf of defendant SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1) L.P., with Certificate of Service
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Opposition
                                      Defendant SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1) L.P.’s Response to Adam Neumann and WE Holdings, LLC’s Motion to Consolidate
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Order
                                        Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing on Motion to Consolidate)
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Stipulation And [proposed} Order
                                          Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing on Motion to Consolidate
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                            Letter to The Honorable Andre G. Bouchard from Kevin M. Coen Setting a Briefing Schedule on the Holdings Plaintiffs’ Motion to Consolidate
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                              Exhibit A to [Proposed] Order Governing Briefing On Motion To Consolidate
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                Granted (Seiler, Eric: [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice to represent Plaintiffs Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC)
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                  Granted (Rabin, Shawn J.: [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice to represent Plaintiffs Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC)
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None Order Pro Hac Vice
                                                    Granted (Carmody, William Christopher: [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice to represent Plaintiffs Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC)
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                      Seiler, Eric: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice to represent Plaintiffs Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC (with Certificate of Service)
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                      Rabin, Shawn J.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice to represent Plaintiffs Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC (with Certificate of Service)
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Carmody, William Christopher: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice to represent Plaintiffs Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC (with Certificate of Service)
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Letter to Chancellor Bouchard from Sabrina M. Hendershot enclosing two Chambers’ copies of Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC's Motion to Consolidate
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Summons
                                                            Summons Pursuant to 6 Del. C. Section 17-105 Directed to Defendant SoftBank Vision Fund (AIV M1), L.P. (with Proof of Service)
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Motion to Consolidate
                                                              Adam Neumann and We Holdings LLC's Motion to Consolidate (with Certificate of Service)
                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Issuance of Summons
                                                              Issued 3104 Summons to law firm (1 copy); Issued Summons to Special Process Server (1 copy)
                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Summons Instructions
                                                                Summons Instruction Letter to Register in Chancery from Sabrina M. Hendershot
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Complaint with 1 or 2 defendants
                                                                  Plaintiffs Adam Neumann and We Holdings, LLC's Verified Complaint for Breach of Contract and Breach of Fiduciary Duty
                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Information Sheet
                                                                  Supplemental Information Sheet with Statement of Good Cause

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?