Chen et al v. USCIS
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01714-JSR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shu Zhu Li, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfred Siu Lui +1 212 925 3438 +1 212 925 6421 alfredlui49@hotmail.com
No Logo Xin Qiang Chen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfred Siu Lui +1 212 925 3438 +1 212 925 6421 alfredlui49@hotmail.com
No Logo Yan Qin Chen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfred Siu Lui +1 212 925 3438 +1 212 925 6421 alfredlui49@hotmail.com
No Logo Yu Bin Chen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfred Siu Lui +1 212 925 3438 +1 212 925 6421 alfredlui49@hotmail.com
v.
No Logo Uscis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank James Loprest, Jr +1 212 637 2728 +1 212 637 2786 james.loprest@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 2/21/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County NewYork
Terminated 7/31/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It is stipulated and agreed that this action be, and hereby is, dismissed as moot, without costs or attorney's fees to any party. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/30/2008) (jfe)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Pretrial Conference - Interim
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Pretrial Conference held on 4/30/2008. (jw)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Answer
      ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by USCIS.(Loprest, Frank)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Pretrial Conference - Initial
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/17/2008. The plaintiff's atty did not appear. The Court scheduled another conference for 4/30/08 @ 11:00 a.m. Contested Issue: No. ( Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2008 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (ja)
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank James Loprest, Jr on behalf of USCIS (Loprest, Frank)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony
            PETITION to Perpetuate Testimony Document filed by Xin Qiang Chen, Shu Zhu Li, Yan Qin Chen, Yu Bin Chen.(Lui, Alfred)
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
              NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/17/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. This Court requires that this case shall be ready for trial on August 27, 2008. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/27/2008) (jpo)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Complaint
                COMPLAINT against USCIS. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 641690)Document filed by Xin Qiang Chen, Shu Zhu Li, Yan Qin Chen, Yu Bin Chen.(laq)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                  Case Designated ECF. (laq)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Case Designation
                    Magistrate Judge Kevin N. Fox is so designated. (laq)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Summons Issued
                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to USCIS. (laq)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 164 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?