District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Virginia Eastern District Court Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Courthouse News Service v. George Schaefer
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 20-1290

Tags
Last Updated July 8, 2021 at 4:02 PM DT (3.7 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALM Media LLC, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Atlantic Media, Inc., Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo California News Publishers Association, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo First Look Media Works, Inc., Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Gannett Company, Incorporated, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo International Documentary Association, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Investigative Reporting Workshop At American University, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Investigative Studios, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Mpa - The Association Of Magazine Media, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo National Association of Broadcasters, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo National Freedom Of Information Coalition, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo National Press Club Journalism Institute, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo National Press Photographers Association, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Newsguild-cwa, The, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Politico LLC, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Radio Television Digital News Association, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Sinclair Broadcast Group, Incorporated, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Society Of Professional Journalists, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
The Associated Press The Associated Press, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo The E.W. Scripps Company, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo The Media Institute, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo The National Press Club, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo The News Leaders Association, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo The Society Of Environmental Journalists, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Virginia Coalition For Open Government, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Virginia Press Association, Amicus Supporting Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Powell
Space Katie Townsend +1 202 795 9303
Space Caitlin Vogus +1 202 795 9315

Toggle Switch Represented by The Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce D. Brown +1 703 807 2100 bbrown@rcfp.org
Space Jennifer Anne Nelson +1 202 795 9312 +1 202 795 9310 jnelson@rcfp.org
No Logo Courthouse News Service, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather Shaw Goldman +1 202 508 6311 heather.goldman@bryancave.com
Space William Jonas Hibsher +1 212 541 1085 +1 212 541 4630 wjhibsher@bclplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLCOX & SAVAGE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conrad Moss Shumadine +1 757 628 5500 +1 757 628 5566 cshumadine@wilsav.com
No Logo George Schaefer, In His Official Capacity As Clerk Of The Circuit Court For Norfolk, Virginia, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by THOMPSON & MCMULLAN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Gordon Matheson +1 804 698 5933 +1 804 780 1813 mmatheson@t-mlaw.com
Space John Paul O'Herron +1 804 649 7545 +1 804 780 1813 joherron@t-mlaw.com
Space William Daniel Prince, IV +1 804 649 7545 +1 804 780 1813 wprince@t-mlaw.com
No Logo Jacqueline Smith, In Her Official Capacity As Clerk Of The Circuit Court For Prince William County, Virginia, Defendant - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by THOMPSON & MCMULLAN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Gordon Matheson +1 804 698 5933 +1 804 780 1813 mmatheson@t-mlaw.com
Space John Paul O'Herron +1 804 649 7545 +1 804 780 1813 joherron@t-mlaw.com
Space William Daniel Prince, IV +1 804 649 7545 +1 804 780 1813 wprince@t-mlaw.com
Nature of Suit 3440 - Civil Rights: Other
Case Type Civil Private
Lower Court Case https://ecf.vaed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=2:18-cv-00391-HCM-LRL
Lower Court Case https://ecf.vaed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=2:18-cv-00391-HCM-LRL
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408490073 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None ?
ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [50] Number of days granted: 30. Copies to all parties. [1000980214] [20-1290, 20-1386] TF
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408488931 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None ?
    MOTION by Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386 to extend filing time for Application for Fees and Costs.. Date and method of service: 07/02/2021 ecf. [1000979655] [20-1290, 20-1386] Heather Goldman
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408476298 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None ?
      JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00391-HCM-LRL. Entered on Docket Date: 06/24/2021. [1000973940] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [20-1290, 20-1386] DL
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408476292 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None ?
        PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00391-HCM-LRL. [1000973937]. [20-1290, 20-1386] DL
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408468892 Filed: 6/17/2021, Entered: None ?
          ORDER filed granting Motion to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel [46] Copies to all parties. [1000970775] [20-1290, 20-1386] DL
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408468217 Filed: 6/16/2021, Entered: None ?
            MOTION by Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386 to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? Y. Was the defendant advised of right to file response within 7 days? N. Date and method of service: 06/16/2021 ecf. [1000970486] [20-1290, 20-1386] Bryan Harrison
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None ?
              ORAL ARGUMENT (Video Conference) heard before the Honorable Diana Gribbon Motz, Robert B. King and James A. Wynn, Jr.. Attorneys arguing case: Ms. Jennifer Anne Nelson for Amici Supporting Appellee The Associated Press, Society of Professional Journalists, National Association of Broadcasters, Sinclair Broadcast Group, Incorporated, The E. W. Scripps Company, Virginia Press Association, The Media Institute, Gannett Company, Incorporated, The New York Times Company, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, International Documentary Association, The National Press Club, National Press Photographers Association, Radio Television Digital News Association, Virginia Coalition for Open Government, Atlantic Media Inc., Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, MPA - The Association of Magazine Media, ALM Media, LLC, The News Leaders Association, The Society of Environmental Journalists, California News Publishers Association, First Look Media Works, Inc., Investigative Studios, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Club Journalism Institute, NewsGuild-CWA and POLITICO LLC, Mr. Michael Gordon Matheson, Esq. for Appellants George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith and William Jonas Hibsher for Appellee Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386. Courtroom Deputy: Joseph Coleman. [1000913093] [20-1290, 20-1386] JLC
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408297106 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None ?
                ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT FOR REMOTE ARGUMENT (restricted access) by ALM Media, LLC, Atlantic Media Inc., Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, California News Publishers Association, First Look Media Works, Inc., Gannett Company, Incorporated, International Documentary Association, Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Investigative Studios, MPA - The Association of Magazine Media, National Association of Broadcasters, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Club Journalism Institute, National Press Photographers Association, NewsGuild-CWA, POLITICO LLC, Radio Television Digital News Association, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Sinclair Broadcast Group, Incorporated, Society of Professional Journalists, The Associated Press, The E. W. Scripps Company, The Media Institute, The National Press Club, The New York Times Company, The News Leaders Association, The Society of Environmental Journalists, Virginia Coalition for Open Government and Virginia Press Association in 20-1290, 20-1386. Counsel arguing: Jennifer A. Nelson. Opening argument time: 3 minutes. [1000892459] [20-1290, 20-1386] Jennifer Nelson
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408294605 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                  COURT ORDER filed granting Motion to participate in oral argument [41] Copies to all parties. [1000891252] [20-1290, 20-1386] TF
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408293851 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None ?
                    ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT FOR REMOTE ARGUMENT (restricted access) by Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386. Counsel arguing: William J. Hibsher. Opening argument time: 17 minutes. [1000890896] [20-1290, 20-1386] William Hibsher
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408290857 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None ?
                      MOTION by ALM Media, LLC, Atlantic Media Inc., Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, California News Publishers Association, First Look Media Works, Inc., Gannett Company, Incorporated, International Documentary Association, Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Investigative Studios, MPA- The Association of Magazine Media, National Association of Broadcasters, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Club Journalism Institute, National Press Photographers Association, NewsGuild-CWA, POLITICO LLC, Radio Television Digital News Association, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Sinclair Broadcast Group, Incorporated, Society of Professional Journalists, The Associated Press, The E. W. Scripps Company, The Media Institute, The National Press Club, The New York Times Company, The News Leaders Association, The Society of Environmental Journalists, Virginia Coalition for Open Government and Virginia Press Association in 20-1290, 20-1386 Bruce D. Brown, Counsel of Record for Amici Curiae to participate in oral argument. Date and method of service: 01/28/2021 ecf. [1000889580] [20-1290, 20-1386] Bruce Brown
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408290811 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None ?
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Jennifer A. Nelson for ALM Media, LLC, Atlantic Media Inc., Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, California News Publishers Association, First Look Media Works, Inc., Gannett Company, Incorporated, International Documentary Association, Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Investigative Studios, MPA- The Association of Magazine Media, National Association of Broadcasters, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Club Journalism Institute, National Press Photographers Association, NewsGuild-CWA, POLITICO LLC, Radio Television Digital News Association, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Sinclair Broadcast Group, Incorporated, Society of Professional Journalists, The Associated Press, The E. W. Scripps Company, The Media Institute, The National Press Club, The New York Times Company, The News Leaders Association, The Society of Environmental Journalists, Virginia Coalition for Open Government and Virginia Press Association in 20-1290, 20-1386. [1000889563] [20-1290, 20-1386] Jennifer Nelson
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408288992 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                          ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT FOR REMOTE ARGUMENT (restricted access) by George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith in 20-1290, 20-1386. Counsel arguing: Michael G. Matheson. Opening argument time: 20 minutes. Answering argument time: 15 minutes. Rebuttal argument time: 5 minutes. [1000888678] [20-1290, 20-1386] John O'Herron
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408288515 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None ?
                            CASE CALENDARED for remote oral argument. Date: 03/09/2021. Argument Starting Time: 2:00 p.m.. Remote oral argument acknowledgment form due within 2 business days. [20-1290, 20-1386] JLC
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408271728 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None ?
                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by John P. O'Herron for George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith in 20-1290, 20-1386. [1000880909] [20-1290, 20-1386] John O'Herron
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408258339 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None ?
                                CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 3/8/21 - 3/12/21 argument session. Counsel shall file 4 paper copies of their briefs and appendices within 7 days. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 01/11/2021. [20-1290, 20-1386] JLC
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Receipt of paper copy of REPLY BRIEF filed at [29] by George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith in 20-1290, 20-1386. Number of pages: [33]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of Copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 01/11/2021. [1000878953] [20-1290, 20-1386] DL
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408043390 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    BRIEF by George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith in 20-1290, 20-1386 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. [1000777287] [20-1290, 20-1386] Michael Matheson
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408027753 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      ORDER filed granting the filing of amicus curiae brief. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. [1000770166] [20-1290, 20-1386] TF
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Receipt of paper copy of AMICUS BRIEF filed at [27] by ALM Media, LLC, Atlantic Media Inc., Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, California News Publishers Association, First Look Media Works, Inc., Gannett Company, Incorporated, International Documentary Association, Investigative Reporting Workshop at American University, Investigative Studios, MPA- The Association of Magazine Media, National Association of Broadcasters, National Freedom of Information Coalition, National Press Club Journalism Institute, National Press Photographers Association, NewsGuild-CWA, POLITICO LLC, Radio Television Digital News Association, Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press, Sinclair Broadcast Group, Incorporated, Society of Professional Journalists, The Associated Press, The E. W. Scripps Company, The Media Institute, The National Press Club, The New York Times Company, The News Leaders Association, The Society of Environmental Journalists, Virginia Coalition for Open Government and Virginia Press Association in 20-1290, 20-1386. . Number of pages: [47]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 01/11/2021. [1000878963] [20-1290, 20-1386] DL
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408026775 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 28 Media Organizations in electronic and paper format. [1000769710] [20-1386, 20-1290] Bruce Brown
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            Receipt of paper copy of RESPONSE BRIEF filed at [26] by Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386. Number of pages: [67]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 06/26/2020. [1000877622] [20-1290, 20-1386] AW
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00408017111 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              BRIEF by Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. [1000765183] [20-1290, 20-1386] Heather Goldman
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [25] by George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith in 20-1290. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [4]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [1570]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 01/11/2021. [1000878957] [20-1290, 20-1386]--[Edited 01/11/2021 by DL -modified to reflect appendix is sufficient] DL
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [24] by George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith in 20-1290, 20-1386. Number of pages: [71]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [4]. Received by clerk date: 01/11/2021. [1000878950] [20-1290, 20-1386] DL
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407976127 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    JOINT APPENDIX (electronic and paper form) by George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith in 20-1290, 20-1386. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. [1000746677] [20-1290, 20-1386] Michael Matheson
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407976118 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      BRIEF by George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith in 20-1290, 20-1386 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. [1000746673] [20-1290, 20-1386] Michael Matheson
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407947587 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        ORDER filed denying Motion to clarify [20] Copies to all parties. [1000733639] [20-1290, 20-1386] TF
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407946627 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          RESPONSE/ANSWER by Jacqueline Smith in 20-1386, George Schaefer in 20-1290 to Motion to clarify [20]. Nature of response: in opposition. [20-1386, 20-1290] Michael Matheson
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407933988 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            NOTICE ISSUED to George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith in 20-1290, 20-1386 requesting response to Motion to clarify [20]Response due 05/04/2020.[1000727367]. [20-1290, 20-1386] TF
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407932483 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              MOTION by Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386 to clarify. Date and method of service: 04/23/2020 ecf. [1000726706] [20-1290, 20-1386] Heather Goldman
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407932327 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Courthouse News Service in 20-1386, 20-1290. [20-1386, 20-1290] Heather Goldman
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407924901 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  BRIEFING ORDER filed. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/27/2020. Response Brief due 06/26/2020 [20-1290, 20-1386] TF
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407923880 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    DOCKETING STATEMENT by George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith. [20-1386] William Prince
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407916014 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William D. Prince IV for George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith in 20-1290, 20-1386. [1000719249] [20-1290, 20-1386] William Prince
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407911655 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Conrad M. Shumadine for Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386. [1000717277] [20-1290, 20-1386] Conrad Shumadine
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407911096 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William Hibsher for Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386. [1000717010] [20-1290, 20-1386] William Hibsher
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407911081 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Bryan Harrison for Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386. [1000717005] [20-1290, 20-1386] Bryan Harrison
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407911069 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Heather Goldman for Courthouse News Service in 20-1290, 20-1386. [1000717000] [20-1290, 20-1386] Heather Goldman
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407904812 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1386 with 20-1290. Copies to all parties. [1000714210] [20-1290, 20-1386] TF
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407899243 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  CORRECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Courthouse News Service in 20-162, 20-1290. [20-162, 20-1290] Heather Goldman
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407893295 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    ORDER filed consolidating case 20-1290 with 20-162. Copies to all parties. [1000708849] [20-162, 20-1290] TF
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407893274 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      ORDER filed rescinding briefing order Copies to all parties. [1000708843] [20-1290] TF
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407889086 Filed: 3/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        BRIEFING ORDER filed. FILING OF PAPER COPIES OF BRIEFS/APPENDICES IS SUSPENDED PENDING FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/04/2020. Response Brief due 06/03/2020 [20-1290] TF
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407888732 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          DOCKETING STATEMENT by George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith. [20-1290] William Prince
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407888716 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000706673] [20-1290] William Prince
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407888713 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William D. Prince IV for George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith. [1000706672] [20-1290] William Prince
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407888604 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Michael G. Matheson for George Schaefer and Jacqueline Smith. [1000706624] [20-1290] Michael Matheson
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407873751 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00391-HCM-LRL. [20-1290] AW
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00407873730 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:18-cv-00391-HCM-LRL. Case manager: AWalker. [20-1290] AW
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?