The MKR Group, Inc. v. Capcom Co. LTD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-01856-DLC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo The MKR Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kenyon & Kenyon, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan David Reichman +1 212 425 7200 +1 212 425 5288 jreichman@kenyon.com
Space Mimi Kristin Rupp +21255621 00x 827 4334 +1 212 556 2222 mrupp@kenyon.com
v.
No Logo Capcom Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Capcom Co. LTD"
No Logo Capcom Entertainment, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Capcom U.s.a., Inc., Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 2/25/2008
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Cause Section 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County NewYork
Terminated 3/31/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - SignedCourt Filing
NOTICE of Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the F.R.C.P., without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/31/08) (cd)
    LREF
    Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of Of Filing Of Waiver Of Service re: Summons Issued. Document filed by The MKR Group, Inc.. (Reichman, Jonathan)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Mail Copyright Form (case opening)
      Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the filing of this action. (rdz)
        LREF
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The MKR Group, Inc..(rdz)
          LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Complaint
          COMPLAINT against Capcom Co. LTD, Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 642988)Document filed by The MKR Group, Inc..(rdz)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Case Designated ECF.
            Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Case Designation
              Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman is so designated. (rdz)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Summons Issued
                SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capcom Co. LTD, Capcom U.S.A., Inc., Capcom Entertainment, Inc.. (rdz)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 171 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?