Ariswala v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 2:08-cv-00085-LAK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hozaifa Ariswala, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by oltarsh.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Oltarsh +1 212 944 9420 +1 212 944 9120 info@oltarsh.com
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Respondent
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo The United States Citizenship & Immigrant Services, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square - Suspense
Filed 1/4/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SUSPENSE
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall place this case on my suspense docket. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/5/08) (dle)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Pretrial Conference - Interim
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Interim Pretrial Conference held and concluded on 2/28/2008. (djc)
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
      ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/28/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/5/08) (cd)
        LREF
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, The United States Citizenship & Immigrant Services, Federal Bureau of Investigation (Oeltjen, Natasha)
          LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus
          PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Department of Homeland Security, The United States Citizenship & Immigrant Services, Federal Bureau of Investigation (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 637337).Document filed by Hozaifa Ariswala.(tro) (mbe).
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Case Designated ECF.
            Case Designated ECF. (tro)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Case Designation
              Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (tro)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 57 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?