USA v. Fils-Aime
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00179-JGK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Foley Square
Filed 3/5/2008
County NewYork
Terminated 3/5/2008
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 9
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206A.F FRAUD AND FALSE STATEMENTS (AIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PREPARATION AND PRESENTATION OF A FALSE AND FRAUDULENT RETURN
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Charlemagne Fils-Aime held on 5/23/08 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (ama)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
    AMENDED JUDGMENT (For Revocation of Probation or Supervised Release) as to Charlemagne Fils-Aime (1)admitted guilt to violation of condition(s) Specification Six of the term of supervision. Supervised release is to continue until May 9, 2009. All conditions of the defendant's supervised release shall remain in effect. The Court recommends that supervision be transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/9/08)(jw)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Louis R. Aidala appearing for Charlemagne Fils-Aime. (pr)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Order Appointing Public DefenderCourt Filing
        ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Charlemagne Fils-Aime. Louis R. Aidala for and appointed.. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/24/08)(pr)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
          CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Charlemagne Fils-Aime. (pr)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Transfer In/Supervised Release - Documents Receive
            TRANSFER IN SUPERVISED RELEASE DOCUMENTS RECEIVED as to Charlemagne Fils-Aime transferred from the United States District Court - Detroit District of Eastern Michigan, Case Number: 04cr90007 MOB. The following documents were received: Certified copy of the judgement. (jm)
              LREF
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Transfer In/Supervised ReleaseCourt Filing
              TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Releasee from the United States District Court - Detroit District of eastern Michigan, as to Charlemagne Fils-Aime (1) count(s) 9. OTHER DISTRICT COURT SENTENCE: Charlemagne Fils-Aime (1), Count(s) 9, In eastern Michigan, defendant is snetenced to 18 months imprisonment followed by 12 months supervised release. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 3/4/08) (jm)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                Case Designated ECF as to Charlemagne Fils-Aime. (jm)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 266 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?