USA v. Owusu
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00191-JES

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space E. Danya Perry +1 212 637 2434 +1 212 637 2387 danya.perry@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Joseph Owusu, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jacob Laufer, P.C.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Laufer +1 212 422 8500 +1 212 422 9038 jlaufer@lauferlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Foley Square
Filed 3/6/2008
County Bronx
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 287.F
Offense Level 4
Count 2-3
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 4-11
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206B.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER as to Joseph Owusu. Whereas, with the consent of defendant JOSEPH OWUSU, a/k/a "Joseph Frimpong," his guilty plea allocution was taken before a United States Magistrate Judge on July 2, 2008, Whereas upon review of the transcript, this Court has determined that the defendant entered the guilty plea knowingly and voluntarily and that there is factual basis for the guilty plea. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant's guilty plea is accepted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 7/8/2008)(D'Avanzo, Daniel)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Joseph Owusu held on 7/02/08 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (ama)
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Joseph Owusu ORDER EXCLUDING TIME UNDER THE SPEEDY TRIAL ACT as to Joseph Owusu. Time excluded from 6/17/08 until 6/25/08. (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 6/17/08)(jw)
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
        STIPULATION as to Joseph Owusu. Time excluded under the speedy trial act from 5/27/08 until 6/17/08 as indicated. So Ordered (see the attached stipulation for the full text) (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 5/28/08)(pr)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
          STIPULATION as to Joseph Owusu. It is hereby stipulated 1. Time be excluded under the STA purs to 18:3161(h)(8)(A), from 4/22/08 until 5/27/08 in order to allow the parties to continue to discuss the disposition of this case as indicated. So Ordered.(see the attached stipulation for the full text) (Signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo on 4/18/08)(pr)
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jacob Laufer appearing for Joseph Owusu. (Laufer, Jacob)
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Waiver of Indictment
              WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Joseph Owusu. (jw)
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Information - Felony
                INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Joseph Owusu (1) count(s) 1, 2-3, 4-11. [Microfilmed on 3/11/08 at 12:00pm] (jw)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: as to Joseph Owusu; Status Conference set for 4/14/2008 before Judge John E. Sprizzo. (jw)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Oral Order
                    ORAL ORDER as to Joseph Owusu as to Joseph Owusu( Status Conference set for 4/14/2008 before Judge John E. Sprizzo.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 3/6/08)(jw)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Plea Entered
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger: Plea entered by Joseph Owusu (1) Count 1,2-3,4-11 Not Guilty. (jw)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Arraignment
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger:Arraignment as to Joseph Owusu (1) Count 1,2-3,4-11 held on 3/6/2008. Deft present with atty Banker. AUSA Danya Perry present. Deft pleads not guilty to information. Conference on 4/14/08 before Judge Sprizzo. T/E until 4/14/08. (jw)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Initial Appearance
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John E. Sprizzo:Initial Appearance as to Joseph Owusu held on 3/6/2008. (jw)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Case Designated ECF.
                            Case Designated ECF as to Joseph Owusu. (jm)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Intent to File Information
                              NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Joseph Owusu. (jw)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 929 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?