GREENSPAN v. BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-01968-TNM
District Judge Trevor N. McFadden, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 4, 2021 at 11:34 AM EDT (3.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Greenspan, Aaron Greenspan, Aaron, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "AARON GREENSPAN"

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Deborah M. Golden, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah Maxine Golden +1 202 630 0332 +1 202 319 1010 dgolden@debgoldenlaw.com
v.
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/20/2021
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/4/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: 9/10/2021 Joint Status Report
    Joint STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Simon, Jeremy)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: 8/31/2021 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER setting a Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference for October 4, 2021, at 2:00 p.m before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Dial-in information will be sent to the parties. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/31/2021. (lctnm3)
        LREF
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: 8/30/2021 Answer
        ANSWER to Complaint by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM.(Simon, Jeremy)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: 7/21/2021 OrderCourt Filing
          STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/21/2021. (lctnm3)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: 7/21/2021 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
            SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # (1) Notice and Consent)(adh, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
              Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: 7/20/2021 Complaint
                COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8613102) filed by AARON GREENSPAN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons, # (3) Summons to USAO DC, # (4) Summons to USAG)(Golden, Deborah)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 947 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?