Steiner et al v. eBay Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:21-cv-11181-DPW
District Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 15, 2021 at 10:44 AM DT (6.1 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David, Steiner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosemary C. Scapicchio +1 617 263 7400 +1 617 742 5761 Rosemary@scapicchiolaw.com
No Logo Ina Steiner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosemary C. Scapicchio +1 617 263 7400 +1 617 742 5761 Rosemary@scapicchiolaw.com
No Logo Steiner Associates, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosemary C. Scapicchio +1 617 263 7400 +1 617 742 5761 Rosemary@scapicchiolaw.com
v.
No Logo Brian Gilbert, Defendant
No Logo David Harville, Defendant
No Logo Wenig, Devin, Defendant
Officially listed as "Devin Wenig"
eBay, Inc. Officer/Director, eBay, Inc.
eBay, Inc. Officer/Director, eBay, Inc.
eBay, Inc. Officer/Director, eBay, Inc.
Officer/Director, General Motors Co

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin Gary Weinberg +1 617 227 3700 +1 617 338 9538 owlmgw@att.net
eBay, Inc. eBay, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Bamboo.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mercadolibre Inc
No Logo James Baugh, Defendant
No Logo John and Jane Does, Defendant
No Logo Philip Cooke, Defendant
No Logo Progressive F.O.R.C.E. Concepts, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Stephanie Popp, Defendant
No Logo Stephanie Stockwell, Defendant
No Logo Steven Wymer, Defendant
No Logo Veronica Zea, Defendant
Office Boston
Filed 7/21/2021
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Middlesex
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Cases
120-cr-10098-WGY-1, 120-cr-10098-WGY-2, 120-cr-10098-WGY-3, 120-cr-10098-WGY-4, 120-cr-10263-PBS-1, 120-cr-10263-PBS-2
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None extension of time
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/8/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: 7/28/2021 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Abbe David Lowell Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8878923 by Devin Wenig. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Weinberg, Martin)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/28/2021, Entered: 7/28/2021 Notice of appearance
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Martin G. Weinberg on behalf of Devin Wenig (Weinberg, Martin)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: 7/21/2021 Summons issued
                                                Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: 7/21/2021 Notice of Case AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: 7/21/2021 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8867164 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by David Steiner, Ina Steiner. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit F, # (7) Civil Cover Sheet, # (8) Civil Cover Sheet Category Form)(Scapicchio, Rosemary)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?