Pirtle v. Tesla Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG21104175

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:32 PM DT (2.3 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pirtle Angela, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Profit Financial Corp
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Feely, John C., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None ?
Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 17 (2 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None ?
    Initial Case Management Conference 12/10/2021 09:00 AM D- 17 (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2021, Entered: None ?Court Filing
      Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None ?
        Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Angela Pirtle (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None ?
          Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (7 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/8/2021, Entered: None ?
            Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 27 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?