USA v. Al Malik Alshahhi, et. al.
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:21-cr-00371-BMC-TAM

Tags
Last Updated July 24, 2021 at 7:08 PM DT (2.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan C Harris +1 718 254 6489 +1 718 254 6076 ryan.harris2@usdoj.gov
Space Hiral D Mehta +1 718 254 6418 +1 718 254 6076 hiral.mehta@usdoj.gov
Space Samuel P. Nitze +1 718 254 6465 +1 718 254 6076 samuel.nitze@usdoj.gov
Space Nathan Daniel Reilly +1 718 254 6196 +1 718 254 6076 nathan.reilly@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Matthew Grimes, Defendant
No Logo Rashid Sultan Rashid Al Malik Alshahhi, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Joseph Barrack, Defendant
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Notice of hearing
NOTICE OF HEARING: An in person arraignment hearing as to Thomas Joseph Barrack, and Matthew Grimes will take place on 7/26/2021 at 12:00 P.M. in Courtroom 4B South before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. (Manson, Eddie)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/2021, Entered: 7/21/2021 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
    Order to Unseal Indictment as to Rashid Sultan Rashid Al Malik Alshahhi, Thomas Joseph Barrack, Matthew Grimes: Upon the application of JACQUELYN M. KASULIS, Acting United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York, by Assistant United States Attorney Ryan C. Harris, for an order unsealing the above-captioned matter in its entirety. WHEREFORE, it is ordered that the above-captioned matter in its entirety be unsealed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/20/2021. (Attachments: # (1) Letter) (Fernandez, Erica)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: 7/17/2021 1 - Sealed Docket Entry AND Document CRCourt Filing
      Letter dated 7/16/2021 as to Rashid Sultan Rashid Al Malik Alshahhi, Thomas Joseph Barrack, Matthew Grimes from the Government to Magistrate Judge Cho. (Marziliano, August)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: 7/17/2021 1 - Sealed Docket Entry AND Document CRCourt Filing
        Limited Order to Unseal Document as to Rashid Sultan Rashid Al Malik Alshahhi, Thomas Joseph Barrack, Matthew Grimes.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 7/16/2021. (Marziliano, August)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: 7/17/2021 1 - Sealed Docket Entry AND Document CRCourt Filing
          Limited Order to Unseal Document as to Rashid Sultan Rashid Al Malik Alshahhi, Thomas Joseph Barrack, Matthew Grimes.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 7/16/2021. (Marziliano, August)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: 7/17/2021 Indictment (Sealed)
            SEALED INDICTMENT as to Rashid Sultan Rashid Al Malik Alshahhi (1) count(s) 1, 2, Thomas Joseph Barrack (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, Matthew Grimes (3) count(s) 1, 2. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Information Sheet, # (2) Sealing Form, # (3) Sealing Cover Sheet) (Marziliano, August)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Complaint (Sealed)Court Filing
              SUPPKEMENTAL SEALED COMPLAINT and affidavit in support of arrest warrant as to Rashid Al-Malik. (Signed by Mag Judge Vera Scanlon dtd 8/16/19) (Attachments: # (1) Sealing Cover Sheet) (Yuen, Sui-May)[1:19-mj-00556-LB *SEALED*]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 Complaint (Sealed)
                SEALED COMPLAINT as to Rashid Al-Malik (1). (Attachments: # (1) Sealing Cover Sheet) (Sica, Michele)[1:19-mj-00556-LB *SEALED*]
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 57 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?